Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1126782

EP1126782 - METHOD FOR IMPROVED IMAGING AND PHOTODYNAMIC THERAPY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.04.2009
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.05.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR
published on 22.06.2011  [2011/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Provectus Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
7327 Oakridge Highway, Suite A
Knoxville TN 37931 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/10]For all designated states
Provectus Pharmatech, Inc.
7327 Oakridge Highway, Suite A
Knoxville TN 37931 / US
Former [2001/35]For all designated states
Photogen, Inc.
7327 Oak Ridge Highway
Knoxville, TN 37931 / US
Inventor(s)01 / DEES, H., Craig
1006 Wyndham Way, Apt. 1517
Knoxville, TN 37923 / US
02 / SCOTT, Timothy
10225 Bob Gray Road
Knoxville, TN 37923 / US
 [2001/35]
Representative(s)Hill, Christopher Michael , et al
Page White & Farrer
Bedford House
John Street
London, WC1N 2BF / GB
[N/P]
Former [2001/35]Hill, Christopher Michael , et al
Page White & Farrer 54 Doughty Street
London WC1N 2LS / GB
Application number, filing date99971283.926.10.1999
[2001/35]
WO1999US25074
Priority number, dateUS1998018438802.11.1998         Original published format: US 184388
[2001/35]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0025665
Date:11.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1126782
Date:29.08.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.05.2000
[2001/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1126782
Date:04.06.2008
Language:EN
[2008/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US11.05.2000
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.04.2003
ClassificationInternational:A61B5/00
[2001/35]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2008/23]
Former [2001/35]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERTEN BILDERZEUGUNG UND PHOTODYNAMISCHEN THERAPIE[2001/35]
English:METHOD FOR IMPROVED IMAGING AND PHOTODYNAMIC THERAPY[2001/35]
French:PROCEDE DE VISUALISATION ET DE THERAPIE PHOTODYNAMIQUE AMELIOREES[2001/35]
Entry into regional phase31.05.2001National basic fee paid 
31.05.2001Search fee paid 
31.05.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
31.05.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.05.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
31.05.2001Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
31.05.2001Examination requested  [2001/35]
25.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.11.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
01.12.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.01.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.05.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.06.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.10.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.11.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.03.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.05.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.11.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.01.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.04.2008Fee for grant paid
17.04.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.03.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/20]
Request for further processing for:01.12.2004Request for further processing filed
01.12.2004Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
20.12.2004Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
24.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
28.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
02.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
29.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
05.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
18.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT04.06.2008
BE04.06.2008
CY04.06.2008
DK04.06.2008
FI04.06.2008
NL04.06.2008
SE04.09.2008
GR05.09.2008
IE26.10.2008
LU26.10.2008
CH31.10.2008
LI31.10.2008
MC31.10.2008
PT04.11.2008
[2011/25]
Former [2010/44]AT04.06.2008
BE04.06.2008
CY04.06.2008
DK04.06.2008
FI04.06.2008
NL04.06.2008
SE04.09.2008
IE26.10.2008
LU26.10.2008
CH31.10.2008
LI31.10.2008
MC31.10.2008
PT04.11.2008
Former [2010/29]AT04.06.2008
BE04.06.2008
DK04.06.2008
FI04.06.2008
NL04.06.2008
SE04.09.2008
IE26.10.2008
LU26.10.2008
CH31.10.2008
LI31.10.2008
MC31.10.2008
PT04.11.2008
Former [2010/06]AT04.06.2008
BE04.06.2008
DK04.06.2008
FI04.06.2008
NL04.06.2008
SE04.09.2008
IE26.10.2008
CH31.10.2008
LI31.10.2008
MC31.10.2008
PT04.11.2008
Former [2009/30]AT04.06.2008
BE04.06.2008
DK04.06.2008
FI04.06.2008
NL04.06.2008
SE04.09.2008
MC31.10.2008
PT04.11.2008
Former [2009/21]AT04.06.2008
BE04.06.2008
DK04.06.2008
FI04.06.2008
NL04.06.2008
SE04.09.2008
PT04.11.2008
Former [2009/12]AT04.06.2008
BE04.06.2008
FI04.06.2008
NL04.06.2008
SE04.09.2008
PT04.11.2008
Former [2009/07]AT04.06.2008
FI04.06.2008
NL04.06.2008
SE04.09.2008
Former [2009/01]AT04.06.2008
FI04.06.2008
NL04.06.2008
Former [2008/49]AT04.06.2008
FI04.06.2008
Documents cited:Search[PX]WO9945869  (ADVANCED CORNEAL SYSTEMS INC [US], et al) [PX] 11-13 * page 10, line 17 - line 29 *;
 [E]WO0007515  (PHOTOGEN INC [US]) [E] 1-4,7,11-15,17 * page 5, line 16 - line 28; claims 4,5,9,10,13,17 *;
 [X]EP0175617  (CYTOGEN CORP [US]) [X] 11-13 * page 10, line 17 - line 29 *;
 [A]WO9502324  (CRYOPHARM CORP [US]) [A] 11-13 * page 17, lines 25-30, page 104; Appendix III, last line; page 57, line 6; claims 182-186 *
International search[X]US5827186  (CHEN JAMES C [US], et al);
 [Y]US4973848  (KOLOBANOV ALEXANDER S [SU], et al);
 [Y]US5576013  (WILLIAMS PATRICIA B [US], et al)
ExaminationUS5435991
 DE4403789