Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1055650

EP1055650 - CARBON-BASED METAL COMPOSITE MATERIAL, METHOD FOR PREPARATION THEREOF AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/48]CARBON-BASED METAL COMPOSITE MATERIAL, METHOD FOR PREPARATION THEREOF AND USE THEREOF
[2014/44]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.09.2015
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip04.09.2015No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 07.10.2015  [2015/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Totankako Co., Ltd.
28-8, Higashitoyonaka-cho 1-chome Toyonaka-shi
Osaka 560-0003 / JP
[2014/44]
Former [2005/28]For all designated states
Totankako Co., Ltd.
28-8, Higashitoyonaka-cho 1-chome
Toyonaka-shi, Osaka 560-0003 / JP
Former [2000/48]For all designated states
Advanced Materials International Company, Ltd.
747-1, Gokanjima
Fuji-shi, Shizuoka 416-2266 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / KAWAMURA, Noriaki Advanced Materials Int. Co., Ltd
747-1, Gokanjima
Fuji-shi, Shizuoka416-2266 / JP
02 / TSUSHIMA, Eiki Advanced Materials Int. Co., Ltd
747-1, Gokanjima
Fuji-shi, Shizuoka 416-2266 / JP
03 / SUZUKI, Nobuyuki
140-15, Shimotogari
Nagaizumi-machi, Sunto-gun
Shizuoka 411-0943 / JP
 [2014/44]
Former [2000/48]01 / KAWAMURA, Noriaki Advanced Materials Int. Co., Ltd
747-1, Gokanjima
Fuji-shi, Shizuoka416-2266 / JP
02 / TSUSHIMA, Eiki Advanced Materials Int. Co., Ltd
747-1, Gokanjima
Fuji-shi, Shizuoka 416-2266 / JP
03 / SUZUKI, Nobuyuki
140-15, Shimotogari Nagaizumi-machi, Sunto-gun
Shizuoka 411-0943 / JP
Representative(s)Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei
Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22
85354 Freising / DE
[2014/44]
Former [2000/48]Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22
85354 Freising / DE
Application number, filing date99971789.511.11.1999
[2014/44]
WO1999JP06304
Priority number, dateJP1998032102111.11.1998         Original published format: JP 32102198
JP1999016549911.06.1999         Original published format: JP 16549999
JP1999017489522.06.1999         Original published format: JP 17489599
[2000/48]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0027776
Date:18.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1055650
Date:29.11.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2000
[2000/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1055650
Date:29.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP18.05.2000
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.12.2001
ClassificationInternational:C04B41/88, H01L23/373
[2002/05]
Former International [2000/48]C04B41/88
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/20]
Former [2000/48]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:KOHLENSTOFFHALTIGE METALL-KOMPOSIT-MATERIALIEN, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN UND VERWENDUNG[2014/44]
English:CARBON-BASED METAL COMPOSITE MATERIAL, METHOD FOR PREPARATION THEREOF AND USE THEREOF[2014/44]
French:MATERIAU COMPOSITE METALLIQUE A BASE DE CARBONE, ET PROCEDES DE PREPARATION ET D'UTILISATION CORRESPONDANTS[2014/44]
Former [2000/48]KOHLENSTOFFHALTIGE METALL-KOMPOSIT-MATERIALIEN, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN UND VERWENDUNG
Former [2000/48]CARBON-BASED METAL COMPOSITE MATERIAL, METHOD FOR PREPARATION THEREOF AND USE THEREOF
Former [2000/48]MATERIAU COMPOSITE METALLIQUE A BASE DE CARBONE, ET PROCEDES DE PREPARATION ET D'UTILISATION CORRESPONDANTS
Entry into regional phase10.08.2000Translation filed 
10.08.2000National basic fee paid 
10.08.2000Search fee paid 
10.08.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
02.11.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.11.2000Examination requested  [2000/52]
17.07.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.01.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.10.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.04.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.11.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.03.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.05.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.09.2014Fee for grant paid
16.09.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
16.09.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP10185363.8   Application deemed to be withdrawn  : 03.10.2010
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.07.2007
Opposition(s)30.07.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2015/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
27.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
26.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
26.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
29.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
27.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
28.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
26.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
16.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 11
30.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 12
10.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 13
12.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 14
02.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 15
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.201113   M06   Fee paid on   10.01.2012
Documents cited:Search[X]DE4318193  (TOKAI CARBON KK [JP]) [X] 1-4,6-8,10-13 * figure 1; examples 1,4-6; claims 1-4; tables 1,2 *;
 [X]FR2758146  (AEROSPATIALE [FR]) [X] 1-4,6-8,10,11,13-17 * page 1, line 29 - line 32; examples 1-5; claims 1-6,10,11; table 1 * * page 14 *;
 [X]EP0673900  (GOODRICH CO B F [US]) [X] 1-7,14-20 * page 4, line 33 - line 35; figure 1; claims 1,12-20; tables 1,2 *;
 [X]US3928662  (KANEKO YASUHISA, et al) [X] 1-4,6,7,14 * example 2; claims 1-6 *
International search[Y]EP0394817
 [Y]JPH09175877
 [Y]JPH02199089
 [Y]JPH03295879
 [Y]DE4100145
 [Y]JPS6249634
 [A]JPH0483784
by applicant DE4318193
  FR2758146
  EP0673900
  US3928662
  JPH09175877
  JPH03295879
  JPH03247563
  JPH08157273