Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1054057

EP1054057 - MUTAGENESIS METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.03.2010
Database last updated on 22.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip19.03.2010No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 21.04.2010  [2010/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Japan Science and Technology Agency
1-8, Honcho 4-chome Kawaguchi-shi
Saitama 332-0012 / JP
[2009/20]
Former [2004/41]For all designated states
Japan Science and Technology Agency
1-8, Honcho 4-chome
Kawaguchi-shi, Saitama 332-0012 / JP
Former [2000/47]For all designated states
Japan Science and Technology Corporation
1-8, Hon-cho 4-chome
Kawaguchi-shi, Saitama 332-0012 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / TANABE, Kiyoshi
1-3-307, Taikoyama 2-chome Kosugi-cho
Imizu-gun Toyama 939-0364 / JP
02 / FURUSAWA, Mitsuru
Park Familia 605, 6-8, Nishikasai 6-chome, Edogawa
Tokyo 134-0088 / JP
[2000/47]
Representative(s)Gardner, Rebecca Katherine , et al
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/47]Gardner, Rebecca , et al
Frank B. Dehn & Co. 179 Queen Victoria Street
London EC4V 4EL / GB
Application number, filing date99971847.111.11.1999
[2000/47]
WO1999JP06294
Priority number, dateJP1998032114311.11.1998         Original published format: JP 32114398
[2000/47]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0028015
Date:18.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1054057
Date:22.11.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2000
[2000/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1054057
Date:13.05.2009
Language:EN
[2009/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP18.05.2000
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.02.2005
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/01, C12N15/11, C12N1/21, C12N15/10
[2005/12]
Former International [2000/47]C12N15/01, C12N15/11, C12N1/21
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/21]
Former [2000/47]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR MUTAGENESE[2000/47]
English:MUTAGENESIS METHOD[2000/47]
French:METHODE DE MUTAGENESE[2000/47]
Entry into regional phase11.08.2000Translation filed 
11.08.2000National basic fee paid 
11.08.2000Search fee paid 
11.08.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
11.08.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/47]
14.08.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.11.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.09.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.11.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.06.2007Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
06.09.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.03.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.09.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.10.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.02.2009Fee for grant paid
26.02.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)16.02.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/16]
Request for further processing for:06.09.2007Request for further processing filed
06.09.2007Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
21.09.2007Decision despatched
01.09.2006Request for further processing filed
01.09.2006Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
19.09.2006Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
28.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
25.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
29.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
23.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
24.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
23.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
28.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[XY]  KRISHNASWAMY SHALINI ET AL, "The high mutator activity of the dnaQ49 allele of Escherichia coli is medium-dependent and results from both defective 3' fwdarw 5'-proofreading and methyl-directed mismatch repair", MUTATION RESEARCH, (1993), vol. 288, no. 2, ISSN 0027-5107, pages 311 - 319, XP002315564 [X] 1-10,13,14 * tables 1-3 * [Y] 11,12

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0027-5107(93)90099-2
 [X]  OLLER ADRIANA R ET AL, "The Escherichia coli galK2 papillation assay: Its specificity and application to seven newly isolated mutator strains", MUTATION RESEARCH, (1993), vol. 292, no. 2, ISSN 0027-5107, pages 175 - 185, XP008042171 [X] 1-8,13,14 * page 180, column L, paragraph 3 - page 181, column L, paragraph 1 * * figures 2,3; table 2 *
 [Y]  HOSSEINI-MAZINANI S M ET AL, "Recovery of active beta-lactamases from Proteus vulgaris and RTEM-1 hybrid by random mutagenesis by using a dnaQ strain of Escherichia coli", ANTIMICROBIAL AGENTS AND CHEMOTHERAPY, (1996), vol. 40, no. 9, ISSN 0066-4804, pages 2152 - 2159, XP002315566 [Y] 11,12 * page 2156, column L, paragraph 2 - column R, paragraph 3 *
 [A]  FOWLER R G ET AL, "CHARACTERIZATION OF MUTATIONAL SPECIFICITY WITHIN THE LAC-1 GENE FOR A MUT-D-5 MUTATOR STRAIN OF ESCHERICHIA-COLI DEFECTIVE IN 3'-5' EXONUCLEASE PROOFREADING ACTIVITY", JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY, (1986), vol. 167, no. 1, ISSN 0021-9193, pages 130 - 137, XP008042178 [A] 4 * abstract *
International search[A]  - IWAKI,T. ET AL., "Preferential replication-dependent mutagenesis in the lagging DNA strand in Escherichia coli", MOL. GEN. GENET.,, (1996), vol. 251, pages 657 - 664, XP002926094

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s004380050214
 [A]  - TRINH,T.Q. ET AL., "Preferential DNA secondary structure mutagenesis in the lagging strand of replication in E. coli", NATURE,, (1991), vol. 352, pages 544 - 547, XP002926095

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/352544a0
 [A]  - ROSCHE,W.A. ET AL., "Differential DNA secondary structure-mediated deletion mutation in the leading and lagging strands", J. BACTERIOL.,, (1995), vol. 177, pages 4385 - 4391, XP002926096
Examination   TANABE K. ET AL, "A conspicuous adaptability to antibiotics in the Escherichia coli mutator strain, dnaQ49", FEMS MICROBIOL.LETT., (19990701), vol. 176, no. 1, pages 191 - 196,
    GRENER A. ET AL, "An efficient random mutagenesis technique using an E. coli mutator strain", MOLECULAR BIOTECHNOLOGY, (199704), vol. 7, no. 2, pages 189 - 195, XP000974365

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF02761755