Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1131530

EP1131530 - A SCREENING ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.07.2003
Database last updated on 20.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT, PT
published on 30.04.2008  [2008/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
VKR Holding A/S
Tobaksvejen 10
2860 So̸borg / DK
[N/P]
Former [2001/37]For all designated states
VKR Holding A/S
Tobaksvejen 10
2860 Soeborg / DK
Inventor(s)01 / RITZ, Anders
Skydsbjergvej 41
DK-5463 Harndrup / DK
02 / ULRIKSEN, Ulrik
Fyrstenborgvej 9
DK-6900 Skjern / DK
 [2001/37]
Representative(s)Raffnsoee, Knud Rosenstand , et al
Awapatent A/S
Rigensgade 11
1316 Copenhagen K / DK
[N/P]
Former [2001/37]Raffnsoee, Knud Rosenstand , et al
Internationalt Patent-Bureau Hoeje Taastrup Boulevard 23
2630 Taastrup / DK
Application number, filing date99972285.311.11.1999
[2001/37]
WO1999DK00620
Priority number, dateDK1976000981412.11.1998         Original published format: DK 981476
[2001/37]
Filing languageDA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0029706
Date:25.05.2000
Language:EN
[2000/21]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1131530
Date:12.09.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.05.2000
[2001/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1131530
Date:18.09.2002
Language:EN
[2002/38]
Type: B8 Corrected title page of specification 
No.:EP1131530
Date:19.03.2003
[2003/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE25.05.2000
ClassificationInternational:E06B9/15, E06B9/56
[2001/37]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2003/11]
Former [2001/37]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU 
Extension statesAL27.04.2001
LT27.04.2001
LV27.04.2001
MK27.04.2001
RO27.04.2001
SI27.04.2001
TitleGerman:EINE FENSTERABSCHIRMVORRICHTUNG[2001/37]
English:A SCREENING ARRANGEMENT[2001/37]
French:UN ENSEMBLE STORE[2001/37]
Entry into regional phase25.05.2000Translation filed 
27.04.2001National basic fee paid 
27.04.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
27.04.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.03.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
27.04.2001Examination requested  [2001/37]
18.02.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
09.04.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.07.2002Fee for grant paid
05.07.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT18.09.2002
BE18.09.2002
CH18.09.2002
FI18.09.2002
GR18.09.2002
IT18.09.2002
LI18.09.2002
SE18.09.2002
IE11.11.2002
LU11.11.2002
CY30.11.2002
DK18.12.2002
PT18.02.2003
ES28.03.2003
MC01.06.2003
[2008/18]
Former [2007/23]AT18.09.2002
BE18.09.2002
CH18.09.2002
FI18.09.2002
GR18.09.2002
LI18.09.2002
SE18.09.2002
IE11.11.2002
LU11.11.2002
CY30.11.2002
DK18.12.2002
ES28.03.2003
MC01.06.2003
Former [2006/44]AT18.09.2002
BE18.09.2002
CH18.09.2002
FI18.09.2002
GR18.09.2002
LI18.09.2002
IE11.11.2002
LU11.11.2002
CY30.11.2002
ES28.03.2003
MC01.06.2003
Former [2004/39]AT18.09.2002
BE18.09.2002
CH18.09.2002
FI18.09.2002
GR18.09.2002
LI18.09.2002
IE11.11.2002
LU11.11.2002
CY30.11.2002
ES28.03.2003
Former [2004/10]AT18.09.2002
BE18.09.2002
CH18.09.2002
FI18.09.2002
GR18.09.2002
LI18.09.2002
IE11.11.2002
CY30.11.2002
ES28.03.2003
Former [2004/05]AT18.09.2002
BE18.09.2002
CH18.09.2002
FI18.09.2002
GR18.09.2002
LI18.09.2002
IE11.11.2002
ES28.03.2003
Former [2004/03]AT18.09.2002
BE18.09.2002
CH18.09.2002
FI18.09.2002
GR18.09.2002
LI18.09.2002
IE11.11.2002
Former [2003/48]AT18.09.2002
BE18.09.2002
CH18.09.2002
FI18.09.2002
GR18.09.2002
LI18.09.2002
Former [2003/39]AT18.09.2002
CH18.09.2002
FI18.09.2002
GR18.09.2002
LI18.09.2002
Former [2003/31]AT18.09.2002
FI18.09.2002
GR18.09.2002
Former [2003/20]FI18.09.2002
GR18.09.2002
Former [2003/14]FI18.09.2002
Cited inInternational search[A]DK165260B  (BUBENDORFF RICHARD);
 [A]DE2947501  (BAUER SIEGFRIED, et al);
 [A]DE19600949  (ROTO FRANK AG [DE]);
 [A]EP0145628  (BUBENDORFF RICHARD);
 [A]EP0371527  (POLYNORM NV [NL]);
 [A]FR2418860  (SARVOT MAURICE [FR]);
 [A]FR2614928  (BUBENDORFF RICHARD [FR]);
 [A]US2183495  (LAUFERSWEILER WILLIAM J);
 [A]US4683932  (BUBENDORFF RICHARD [FR])