blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1052895 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1052895



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 58
01.12.2004 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
26.11.2004 Confirmation of withdrawal of application/closure of proceedings Search / examination 1
19.11.2004 Final instructions (application deemed to be withdrawn/application refused) Search / examination 1
09.08.2004 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of renewal fee) Search / examination 1
08.06.2004 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
25.05.2004 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
25.05.2004 European search report Search / examination 1
04.02.2004 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
12.10.2000 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
11.10.2000 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
05.09.2000 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
05.09.2000 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
05.09.2000 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
05.09.2000 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 1
05.09.2000 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 7
31.08.2000 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 11
21.06.2000 Priority document Search / examination 8
16.06.2000 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
08.06.2000 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
08.06.2000 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 11