blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1052895


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
26.11.2004 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  12.01.2005  [2005/02]
02.08.2004 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
21.05.2004 Supplementary search report published on  07.07.2004  [2004/28]
31.01.2004 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
22.11.2002 Renewal fee
15.11.2001 Renewal fee
06.10.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  22.11.2000 [2000/47]
06.10.2000 Request for examination filed published on  22.11.2000 [2000/47]
02.10.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
29.09.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
18.09.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
11.09.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
14.06.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
09.06.2000 PCT data prior to European publication