blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP1052895
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1052895Global Dossier 07.07.2004A4
EP1052895 22.11.2000A1
Priority number Date
NZ33311498 02.12.1998
NZ9900210 02.12.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU1419800 19.06.2000A
Priority number Date
NZ33311498 02.12.1998
NZ9900210 02.12.1999
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
NZ506036 28.02.2003A
Priority number Date
NZ33311498 02.12.1998
NZ9900210 02.12.1999
NZ50603699 02.12.1999
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO0032033Global Dossier 08.06.2000A1
Priority number Date
NZ33311498 02.12.1998