Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1052895

EP1052895 - CHEESE BLOCK FORMING TOWER OF VARIED TAPER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  26.11.2004
Database last updated on 19.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.11.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 12.01.2005  [2005/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Scherping Systems Limited
Airport Road, RD 2
Hamilton 2021 / NZ
[2000/47]
Inventor(s)01 / MISSION, Gregory, Charles
65 Taane Road
Maungatautari, Cambridge 2351 / NZ
[2000/47]
Representative(s)McCarthy, Denis Alexis , et al
MacLachlan & Donaldson
Unit 10, 4075 Kingswood Road
Citywest Business Campus
Dublin D24 C56E / IE
[N/P]
Former [2000/47]McCarthy, Denis Alexis , et al
MacLachlan & Donaldson 47 Merrion Square
Dublin 2 / IE
Application number, filing date99972889.202.12.1999
[2000/47]
WO1999NZ00210
Priority number, dateNZ1998033311402.12.1998         Original published format: NZ 33311498
[2000/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0032033
Date:08.06.2000
Language:EN
[2000/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1052895
Date:22.11.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.06.2000
[2000/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AU08.06.2000
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.05.2004
ClassificationInternational:A01J25/11, A01J25/12
[2000/47]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/47]
TitleGerman:TURM ZUM FORMEN VON KÄSEBLOCKEN, MIT VARIABLER KONIZITÄT[2000/47]
English:CHEESE BLOCK FORMING TOWER OF VARIED TAPER[2000/47]
French:TOUR SERVANT A PRODUIRE DES BLOCS DE FROMAGE DE CONICITE VARIABLE[2000/47]
Entry into regional phase31.08.2000National basic fee paid 
31.08.2000Search fee paid 
21.09.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
21.09.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.09.2000Examination requested  [2000/47]
01.07.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/02]
09.08.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2005/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
13.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200305   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search   [ ] No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[X]US5146845  (PITTELKO ALLEN J [US]);
 [X]US5572925  (VAN PAY STEPHEN J [US], et al);
 [Y]US4332831  (RUST ROBERT R);
 [Y]GB1542844  (WINCANTON ENG)
by applicantGB1187964
 GB1542844
 US3982480
 US4539902
 NZ265118