Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1052311

EP1052311 - PLATING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  08.01.2010
Database last updated on 22.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip08.01.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 10.02.2010  [2010/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
EBARA CORPORATION
11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho Ohta-ku
Tokyo 144-8510 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/46]For all designated states
EBARA CORPORATION
11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho
Ohta-ku, Tokyo 144-8510 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / KURIYAMA, Fumio, Ebara Corporation
11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho, Ohta-ku
Tokyo 144-8510 / JP
02 / UEYAMA, Hiroyuki, Ebara Corporation
11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho, Ohta-ku
Tokyo 144-8510 / JP
03 / YAMAKAWA, Junitsu, Ebara Corporation
11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho, Ohta-ku
Tokyo 144-8510 / JP
04 / SUZUKI, Kenichi, Ebara Corporation
11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho, Ohta-ku
Tokyo 144-8510 / JP
05 / CHONO, Atsushi, Ebara Corporation
11-1, Haneda Asahi-cho, Ohta-ku
Tokyo 144-8510 / JP
[2000/46]
Representative(s)Wagner, Karl H. , et al
Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]Wagner, Karl H. , et al
Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Former [2000/46]Wagner, Karl H., Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Wagner & Geyer, Patentanwälte, Gewürzmühlstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date99973080.726.11.1999
[2000/46]
WO1999JP06600
Priority number, dateJP1998034057630.11.1998         Original published format: JP 34057698
JP1998034261102.12.1998         Original published format: JP 34261198
[2000/46]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0032850
Date:08.06.2000
Language:EN
[2000/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1052311
Date:15.11.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.06.2000
[2000/46]
Search report(s)International search reportJP08.06.2000
(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP17.05.2006
ClassificationInternational:C25D19/00, C25D21/14, C25D21/16
[2000/46]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/20]
Former [2000/46]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:ELEKTROPLATTIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG[2000/46]
English:PLATING MACHINE[2000/46]
French:MACHINE DE GALVANOPLASTIE[2000/46]
Entry into regional phase24.07.2000Translation filed 
24.07.2000National basic fee paid 
24.07.2000Search fee paid 
24.07.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
24.07.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/46]
04.02.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.08.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/06]
22.09.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2010/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
28.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
24.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
29.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
30.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
29.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
28.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
25.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200911   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search   [ ] No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[A]JPH10121297  (NIPPON RIIRONAALE KK);
 [A]JPH05179496  (SANSHIN SEISAKUSHO KK)