Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1051711

EP1051711 - SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE COMPRISING A NON-VOLATILE MEMORY WHICH IS ERASABLE BY MEANS OF UV IRRADIATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.05.2004
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip28.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 30.04.2008  [2008/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2000/46]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / WIDDERSHOVEN, Franciscus, P.
Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
[2000/46]
Representative(s)Duijvestijn, Adrianus Johannes , et al
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2001/15]Duijvestijn, Adrianus Johannes , et al
Internationaal Octrooibureau B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6
5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
Former [2000/46]Houbiers, Ernest Emile Marie Gerlach
INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6
5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date99973161.518.11.1999
[2000/46]
WO1999EP08947
Priority number, dateEP1998020405101.12.1998         Original published format: EP 98204051
[2000/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0033317
Date:08.06.2000
Language:EN
[2000/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1051711
Date:15.11.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.06.2000
[2000/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1051711
Date:09.07.2003
Language:EN
[2003/28]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.06.2000
ClassificationInternational:G11C16/18
[2000/46]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2003/28]
Former [2000/46]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:HALBLEITERANORDNUNG MIT EINEM MITTELS UV-BESTRAHLUNG LÖSCHBAREM NICHTFLÜCHTIGENSPEICHER[2000/46]
English:SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE COMPRISING A NON-VOLATILE MEMORY WHICH IS ERASABLE BY MEANS OF UV IRRADIATION[2000/46]
French:DISPOSITIF SEMI-CONDUCTEUR COMPRENANT UNE MEMOIRE NON VOLATILE EFFA ABLE PAR RAYONNEMENT U.V.[2000/46]
Entry into regional phase01.09.2000National basic fee paid 
08.12.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
08.12.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.12.2000Examination requested  [2001/05]
30.10.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.05.2003Fee for grant paid
09.05.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.04.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
02.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT09.07.2003
NL09.07.2003
[2008/18]
Former [2004/10]NL09.07.2003
Cited inInternational search[A]DE3622394  (BRON ELEKTRONIK AG [CH]) [A] 1-9 * column 1, line 50 - column 2, line 50 *;
 [A]GB2189346  (INTEL CORP) [A] 1-9 * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 88 * * figure 1 *