Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1052713

EP1052713 - NON-AQUEOUS ELECTROLYTE SECONDARY CELL AND ITS CHARGING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.04.2009
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip03.04.2009No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 06.05.2009  [2009/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Panasonic Corporation
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi
Osaka 571-8501 / JP
[2008/47]
Former [2008/22]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD
1006, Oaza Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP
Former [2000/46]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Ohaza Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / INOUE, Kaoru
22-24-302, Shinbashi-cho
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-0048 / JP
02 / YOSHIZAWA, Hiroshi
22-5-506, Fujisakakita-machi
Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-0151 / JP
03 / KOSHINA, Hizuru
30-2-214, Miiminami-machi
Neyagawa-shi, Osaka 572-0019 / JP
04 / SHIMAMURA, Harunari
2-56-3, Kuzuhanoda
Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-1103 / JP
05 / NITTA, Yoshiaki
1-53-6, Nishifunahashi
Hirakata-shi, Osaka 573-1122 / JP
[2000/46]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/46]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date99973176.330.11.1999
[2000/46]
WO1999JP06688
Priority number, dateJP1998034288902.12.1998         Original published format: JP 34288998
JP1998034289002.12.1998         Original published format: JP 34289098
JP1998034289102.12.1998         Original published format: JP 34289198
JP1998034289202.12.1998         Original published format: JP 34289298
JP1998034290302.12.1998         Original published format: JP 34290398
JP1998034290402.12.1998         Original published format: JP 34290498
[2000/46]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0033402
Date:08.06.2000
Language:EN
[2000/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1052713
Date:15.11.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.06.2000
[2000/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1052713
Date:28.05.2008
Language:EN
[2008/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP08.06.2000
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.02.2005
ClassificationInternational:H01M4/02, H01M4/38, H01M10/40, H01M10/44
[2000/46]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2004/20]
Former [2000/46]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:SEKUNDÄRZELLE MIT NICHTWÄSSRIGEM ELEKTROLYTEN UND VEFAHREN ZU DESSEN AUFLADUNG[2000/46]
English:NON-AQUEOUS ELECTROLYTE SECONDARY CELL AND ITS CHARGING METHOD[2000/46]
French:CELLULE SECONDAIRE D'ELECTROLYTE DU TYPE NON AQUEUX ET SON PROCEDE DE CHARGE[2000/46]
Entry into regional phase31.07.2000Translation filed 
31.07.2000National basic fee paid 
31.07.2000Search fee paid 
31.07.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
31.07.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/46]
26.05.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.10.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.12.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.04.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.07.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.09.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.11.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.04.2008Fee for grant paid
08.04.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.03.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
28.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
28.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
26.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
29.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
29.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
29.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[XY]JPH1092424  ;
 [PXY]EP0883199  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [PX] 1-3 * page 5, line 56 - page 6, line 22 * * page 7, line 40 - line 45 * * page 8, line 4 - line 26; tables 1,2 * * claim 1 * [PY] 4;
 [PX]JPH10316426  ;
 [E]EP1028476  (SUMITOMO METAL IND [JP], et al) [E] 1-3 * paragraphs [0036] , [0037] , [0039]; claims 1,2,11-13; table 6 *;
 [Y]WO9852244  (VALENCE TECHNOLOGY INC [US], et al) [Y] 4 * page 5, line 5 - line 13 * * page 6, line 22 - page 7, line 5 *;
 [Y]JPH07296854  ;
 [A]JPH0495345  ;
 [A]US4950566  (HUGGINS ROBERT A [US], et al) [A] 1-4 * column 3, line 63 - column 4, line 6; claim 1 *
 [XY]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980731), vol. 1998, no. 09, [X] 1-3 * abstract * [Y] 4
 [PX]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990331), vol. 1999, no. 03, [PX] 1-3 * abstract *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960329), vol. 1996, no. 03, [Y] 4 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920715), vol. 016, no. 324, Database accession no. (E - 1234), [A] 1-4 * abstract *
International search[A]JPH1092424  (MITSUBISHI CABLE IND LTD);
 [AE]JPH11185753  (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD);
 [AE]JPH10316426  (TOKUYAMA CORP);
 [A]US5770333  (SAITO AKIHIKO [JP], et al);
 [A]JPH05234593  (SONY CORP);
 [A]JPH10257687  (KENWOOD CORP);
 [A]JPH07296854  (MITSUI BUSSAN)