Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1052313

EP1052313 - SILICON WAFER AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.08.2009
Database last updated on 16.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.08.2009No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 16.09.2009  [2009/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Shin-Etsu Handotai Co., Ltd.
6-2, Ohtemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo / JP
[2008/41]
Former [2000/46]For all designated states
Shin-Etsu Handotai Co., Ltd
4-2 Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0005 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / KOBAYASHI, Norihiro, Isobe R & D Center
Shin-Etsu Handotai Co., Ltd., 13-1, Isobe 2-chome
Annaka-shi, Gumma 379-0196 / JP
02 / AKIYAMA, Shoji, Isobe R & D Center
Shin-Etsu Handotai Co., Ltd., 13-1, Isobe 2-chome
Annaka-shi, Gumma 379-0196 / JP
03 / ABE, Takao, Isobe R & D Center
Shin-Etsu Handotai Co., Ltd., 13-1, Isobe 2-chome
Annaka-shi, Gumma 379-0196 / JP
[2000/46]
Representative(s)Cooper, John , et al
Murgitroyd & Company
Scotland House
165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/46]Cooper, John , et al
Murgitroyd & Company, Chartered Patent Agents, 373 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8QA / GB
Application number, filing date99973311.601.12.1999
[2000/46]
WO1999JP06732
Priority number, dateJP1998034617304.12.1998         Original published format: JP 34617398
[2000/46]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0034553
Date:15.06.2000
Language:EN
[2000/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1052313
Date:15.11.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.06.2000
[2000/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1052313
Date:08.10.2008
Language:EN
[2008/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP15.06.2000
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.04.2002
ClassificationInternational:C30B29/06, C30B33/12, H01L21/306, C30B33/00
[2002/21]
Former International [2000/46]C30B29/06, C30B33/12, H01L21/306
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2004/22]
Former [2000/46]AT,  BE,  CH,  CY,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:SILIZIUMWAFER UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG[2000/46]
English:SILICON WAFER AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURE THEREOF[2000/46]
French:TRANCHE DE SILICIUM ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION[2000/46]
Entry into regional phase04.08.2000Translation filed 
18.08.2000National basic fee paid 
18.08.2000Search fee paid 
18.08.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
18.08.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.08.2000Examination requested  [2000/46]
15.10.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.02.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.05.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.08.2008Fee for grant paid
15.08.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)09.07.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2009/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
12.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
12.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
03.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
05.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 07
05.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 08
05.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[PX]EP0955671  (SHINETSU HANDOTAI KK [JP]) [PX] 1,4 * column 15, line 44 - column 16, line 37; claims 1,9,11 *;
 [A]US5738942  (KUBOTA ATSUKO [JP], et al) [A] 1,4 * column 5, line 7 - line 23; figure 1A *;
 [A]US5788763  (HAYASHI KENRO [JP], et al)
International search[A]JPH07235534  (TOSHIBA CERAMICS CO);
 [A]EP0867928  (SHINETSU HANDOTAI KK [JP])