Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1080164

EP1080164 - INSTALLATION FOR THERMOLYSIS PROCESSING OF WASTE WITH FUMES THAT HAVE A LOW FREE OXYGEN CONTENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  24.09.2004
Database last updated on 22.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip24.09.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 10.11.2004  [2004/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nexus Technologies
Zone Industrielle des Iscles, Avenue des Confignes
13160 Châteaurenard / FR
[2001/10]
Inventor(s)01 / MILLES, Philippe
510, chemin des Gypières
F-84800 Isle sur Sorgue / FR
02 / PASQUINUCCI, Lionel
13, L'Oliveraie
F-13240 Septemes les Vallons / FR
03 / DABBAGH, Tamim
SD8-No7 Résidence le Canal avenue Paradis St Roch
F-13500 Martigues / FR
 [2001/10]
Representative(s)Santarelli
49, avenue des Champs-Elysées
75008 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2003/18]Santarelli
14, avenue de la Grande Armée, B.P. 237
75822 Paris Cedex 17 / FR
Former [2001/10]Quantin, Bruno Marie Henri
Rinuy, Santarelli, 14 Avenue de la Grande Armée, B.P. 237
75822 Paris Cedex 17 / FR
Application number, filing date99973715.825.02.1999
[2001/10]
WO1999FR00428
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0050537
Date:31.08.2000
Language:FR
[2000/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1080164
Date:07.03.2001
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.08.2000
[2001/10]
Search report(s)International search reportEP31.08.2000
ClassificationInternational:C10B53/00, C10B1/04, C10B7/14
[2001/10]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/10]
TitleGerman:ANLAGE ZUR THERMOLYSE VON ABFALL MIT EINEM RAUCHGAS MIT NIEDRIGEM GEHALT AN FREIEM SAUERSTOFF[2001/10]
English:INSTALLATION FOR THERMOLYSIS PROCESSING OF WASTE WITH FUMES THAT HAVE A LOW FREE OXYGEN CONTENT[2001/10]
French:INSTALLATION DE TRAITEMENT THERMOLYTIQUE DE DECHETS AVEC DES FUMEES A FAIBLE TENEUR EN OXYGENE LIBRE[2001/10]
Entry into regional phase18.10.2000National basic fee paid 
18.10.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
18.10.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.10.2000Examination requested  [2001/10]
08.01.2001Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.12.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.05.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/46]
09.06.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2004/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
28.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
25.02.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.200204   M06   Fee paid on   28.08.2002
29.02.200406   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[Y]EP0610120  (THERMOLYSE SOC FRANCE [FR]) [Y] 1-13 * figure -; claim - *;
 [Y]US4000705  (RABER J WAYNE) [Y] 1-7,10 * figure -; claim - *;
 [Y]EP0302310  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 8,9 * figure 1; claim - *;
 [Y]FR2261491  (COUDERC JEAN MICHEL [FR]) [Y] 11-13 * figure -; claim - *;
 [A]DE4202321  (GORSKI ADOLF [DE]);
 [A]EP0007620  (PYROLYSE & PROZESSANLAGENTECH [DE]);
 [A]FR2518525  (NIPPON FURNACE KOGYO KK [JP])