EP1254422 - DIGITAL DISEASE MANAGEMENT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.06.2007 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.07.2007 [2007/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE BOARD OF REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF OKLAHOMA 1000 Asp Avenue Norman, OK 78019 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/45] | For all designated states The Board of Regents of the University of Oklahoma 1000 Asp Avenue Norman, OK 78019 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HILDEBRAND, P., Lloyd 2309 Yorkshire Drive Edmond, OK 73013 / US | 02 /
FRANSEN, Stephen, R. 13920 Sterlington Edmond, OK 73013 / US | 03 /
SODERSTROM HOPPER, Gene, M. 1415 Canterbury Place Oklahoma City, OK 73116 / US | [2002/45] | Representative(s) | Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer, et al Ladas & Parry LLP Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/45] | Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99973887.5 | 03.06.1999 | [2002/45] | WO1999US12428 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0075853 | Date: | 14.12.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1254422 | Date: | 06.11.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G06F19/00 | [2002/45] | CPC: |
G16H10/60 (EP,US);
G16H40/20 (EP,US);
G16H70/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/45] | Title | German: | DIGITALES KRANKHEITSVERWAL TUNGSSYSTEM | [2002/45] | English: | DIGITAL DISEASE MANAGEMENT SYSTEM | [2002/45] | French: | SYSTEME NUMERIQUE DE GESTION DE MALADIES | [2002/45] | Entry into regional phase | 09.04.2002 | National basic fee paid | 09.04.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.04.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.11.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 09.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/45] | 23.06.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/27] | 26.01.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2007/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 13.03.2002 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   23.04.2002 | 13.03.2002 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   23.04.2002 | 13.03.2002 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   23.04.2002 | 13.03.2002 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   23.04.2002 | 13.03.2002 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   23.04.2002 | 13.03.2002 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   23.04.2002 | 13.03.2002 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   23.04.2002 | 13.03.2002 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   23.04.2002 | 13.03.2002 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   23.04.2002 | 13.03.2002 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   23.04.2002 | 13.03.2002 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   23.04.2002 | 13.03.2002 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   23.04.2002 | 13.03.2002 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   23.04.2002 | 13.03.2002 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   23.04.2002 | 13.03.2002 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   23.04.2002 | 13.03.2002 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   23.04.2002 | 13.03.2002 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   23.04.2002 | 13.03.2002 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   23.04.2002 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 13.03.2002 | M01   Fee paid on   23.04.2002 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 03.01.2002 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   09.04.2002 | 30.06.2003 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   09.09.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]US5619991 (SLOANE NEIL J A [US]) [X] 1-3,5-8,10,11,17,22-24,26 * column 2, line 60 - column 12, line 15; figures 1-7 * [A] 16,27; | [A]US5513101 (PINSKY HOWARD [US], et al) [A] 1,6,11,16,17,22,27 * column 1, line 9 - column 16, line 35; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US5216596 (WEINSTEIN RONALD S [US]) [A] 1,6,11,16,17,22,27 * column 1, line 8 - column 3, line 30 * * column 4, line 7 - column 6, line 37; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0874325 (UNITRON MEDICAL COMMUNICATIONS [US]) [A] 1,6,11,16,17,22,27 * column 1, line 36 - column 3, line 57; figure 1 *; | [A]US5586024 (SHAIBANI SAAMI J [US]) [A] 1,6,11,16,17,22,27 * column 2, line 24 - column 4, line 9 *; | [E]US5940802 (HILDEBRAND P LLOYD [US], et al) [E] 1-31 * the whole document * |