Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1235792

EP1235792 - PREPARATION OF 4S-(4ALPHA,7ALPHA,10ABETA) -4-AMINO-OCTAHYDRO-5-OXO-7H-PYRIDO 2,1-B 1,3 THIAZEPINE-7-CARBOXYLIC ACID, METHYL ESTER AND SALTS THEREOF VIA NOVEL DISULFIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2002/36]PREPARATION OF [4S-(4ALPHA,7ALPHA,10ABETA)]-4-AMINO-OCTAHYDRO-5-OXO-7H-PYRIDO 2,1-B] 1,3]THIAZEPINE-7-CARBOXYLIC ACID, METHYL ESTER AND SALTS THEREOF VIA NOVEL DISULFIDES
[2007/46]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  05.08.2005
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 27.08.2008  [2008/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bristol-Myers Squibb Company
Route 206 and Province Line Road
Princeton, NJ 08543 / US
[N/P]
Former [2002/36]For all designated states
BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY
P.O. Box 4000
Princeton, NJ 08543-4000 / US
Inventor(s)01 / MONIOT, Jerome, L.
139 South Road
Chester, NJ 07930 / US
02 / RAMIG, Keith
389 Lawn Ridge Road
Orange, NJ 07050 / US
03 / JASS, Paul, A.
315 East Pleasant Grove Road
Jackson, NJ 08527 / US
04 / DILLON, John, L., Jr.
7309 Snowball Run
East Syracuse, NY 13057 / US
05 / RACHA, Saibaba
7401 Highbridge Terrace
Fayetteville, NY 13066 / US
06 / SHRIVASTAVA, Sushil, K.
9 Kayann Drive
Dayton, NJ 08810 / US
07 / WINTER, William, J.
160 Union Street
Montgomery, NY 12549 / US
08 / VENIT, John, J.
260 Dawes Road
North Brunswick, NJ 08902 / US
09 / SWAMINATHAN, Shankar
8 Albury Way
North Brunswick, NJ 08902 / US
10 / SIMPSON, James
8 Apple Hill Road
Belle Mead, NJ 08502-3812 / US
11 / CHEN, Chien-Kuang
58 Robertsville Road
Marlboro, NJ 07746 / US
12 / PACK, Shawn, K.
248 Becks Wood Drive
Bear, DE 19701 / US
13 / SCHWINDEN, Mark, D.
1907 Hopkins Court
Holland, PA 18966 / US
 [2003/19]
Former [2002/50]01 / MONIOT, Jerome, L.
139 South Road
Chester, NJ 07930 / US
02 / RAMIG, Keith
389 Lawn Ridge Road
Orange, NJ 07050 / US
03 / JASS, Paul, A.
315 East Pleasant Grove Road
Jackson, NJ 08527 / US
04 / DILLON, John, L., Jr.
7309 Snowball Run
East Syracuse, NY 13057 / US
05 / RACHA, Saibaba
7401 Highbridge Terrace
Fayetteville, NY 13066 / US
06 / SHRIVASTAVA, Sushil, K.
9 Kayann Drive
Dayton, NJ 08810 / US
07 / WINTER, William, J.
160 Union Street
Montgomery, NY 12549 / US
08 / VENIT, John, J.
260 Dawes Road
North Brunswick, NJ 08902 / US
09 / SWAMINATHAN, Shankar
8 Albury Way
North Brunswick, NJ 08902 / US
10 / SIMPSON, James
8 Apple Hill Road
Belle Mead, NJ 08502-3812 / US
11 / CHEN, Chien-Kuang
58 Robertsville Road
Marlboro, NJ 07746 / US
12 / PACK, Shawn, K.
3500 Powelton Ave., Apt. C-312
Philadelphia, PA 19104 / US
13 / SCHWINDEN, Mark, D.
1907 Hopkins Court
Holland, PA 18966 / US
Former [2002/36]01 / MONIOT, Jerome, L.
139 South Road
Chester, NJ 07930 / US
02 / RAMIG, Keith
389 Lawn Ridge Road
Orange, NJ 07050 / US
03 / JASS, Paul, A.
315 East Pleasant Grove Road
Jackson, NJ 08527 / US
04 / DILLON, John, L., Jr.
7309 Snowball Run
East Syracuse, NY 13057 / US
05 / RACHA, Saibaba
408 Summerhaven Drive
East Syracuse, NY 13057 / US
06 / SHRIVASTAVA, Sushil, K.
9 Kayann Drive
Dayton, NJ 08810 / US
07 / WINTER, William, J.
160 Union Street
Montgomery, NY 12549 / US
08 / VENIT, John, J.
260 Dawes Road
North Brunswick, NJ 08902 / US
09 / SWAMINATHAN, Shankar
8 Albury Way
North Brunswick, NJ 08902 / US
10 / SIMPSON, James
8 Apple Hill Road
Belle Mead, NJ 08502-3812 / US
11 / CHEN, Chien-Kuang
58 Robertsville Road
Marlboro, NJ 07746 / US
12 / PACK, Shawn, K.
3509 Quail Ridge Drive
Plainsboro, NJ 08536 / US
13 / SCHWINDEN, Mark, D.
1907 Hopkins Court
Holland, PA 18966 / US
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [2002/36]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date99974268.729.07.1999
[2002/36]
WO1999US15380
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0242258
Date:30.05.2002
Language:EN
[2002/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1235792
Date:04.09.2002
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.05.2002
[2002/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US30.05.2002
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.05.2003
ClassificationInternational:C07C261/00, C07C229/04, C07C229/22, C07D281/02
[2002/36]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2002/36]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:HERSTELLUNG VON 4S-(4-g(a),7-g(a),10A-g(b)) -4-AMINO-OCTAHYDRO-5-OXO-7H-PYRIDO 2,1-B 1,3 THIAZEPIN-7-CARBONSÄURE METHYLESTER UND SEINER SALZE VIA NEUE DISULFIDE[2007/46]
English:PREPARATION OF 4S-(4ALPHA,7ALPHA,10ABETA) -4-AMINO-OCTAHYDRO-5-OXO-7H-PYRIDO 2,1-B 1,3 THIAZEPINE-7-CARBOXYLIC ACID, METHYL ESTER AND SALTS THEREOF VIA NOVEL DISULFIDES[2007/46]
French:PREPARATION DE L'ESTER METHYLIQUE DE L'ACIDE 4S-(4ALPHA,7ALPHA,10ABETA) -4-AMINO-OCTAHYDRO-5-OXO-7H-PYRIDO 2,1-B 1,3 THIAZEPINE-7-CARBOXYLIQUE, ET DE SES SELS VIA DE NOUVEAUX DISULFURES[2007/46]
Former [2002/36]HERSTELLUNG VON 4S-(4-g(a),7-g(a),10A-g(b))]-4-AMINO-OCTAHYDRO-5-OXO-7H-PYRIDO 2,1-B] 1,3]THIAZEPIN-7-CARBONSÄURE METHYLESTER UND SEINER SALZE VIA NEUE DISULFIDE
Former [2002/36]PREPARATION OF [4S-(4ALPHA,7ALPHA,10ABETA)]-4-AMINO-OCTAHYDRO-5-OXO-7H-PYRIDO 2,1-B] 1,3]THIAZEPINE-7-CARBOXYLIC ACID, METHYL ESTER AND SALTS THEREOF VIA NOVEL DISULFIDES
Former [2002/36]PREPARATION DE L'ESTER METHYLIQUE DE L'ACIDE [4S-(4ALPHA,7ALPHA,10ABETA)]-4-AMINO-OCTAHYDRO-5-OXO-7H-PYRIDO 2,1-B] 1,3]THIAZEPINE-7-CARBOXYLIQUE, ET DE SES SELS VIA DE NOUVEAUX DISULFURES
Entry into regional phase19.02.2002National basic fee paid 
19.02.2002Search fee paid 
19.02.2002Designation fee(s) paid 
19.04.2002Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.01.2000Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
19.04.2002Examination requested  [2002/36]
25.09.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.01.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
14.05.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.11.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.03.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/38]
19.04.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2005/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.03.2002Renewal fee patent year 03
12.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
14.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 05
14.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
04.03.200203   M06   Fee paid on   04.03.2002
Documents cited:Search[X]WO9935145  (SQUIBB BRISTOL MYERS CO [US]) [X] 1,2,4 * page 2, line 7 - line 26 *
International search[A]US5508272  (ROBL JEFFREY A [US])