Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2247752 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2247752



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1709
29.06.2017 Communication of amended entries Search / examination 2
28.06.2017 Communication to the parties concerning termination of the opposition proceedings - opposition rejected - no appeal lodged Opposition 1
28.06.2017 Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (opponent) Opposition 1
28.06.2017 Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (opponent) Opposition 1
23.06.2017 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 1
11.05.2017 Request concerning representative opponent Search / examination 2
05.04.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
31.03.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
28.03.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
24.03.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
16.03.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
15.03.2017 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
14.03.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
14.03.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
14.03.2017 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
14.03.2017 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 2
14.03.2017 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
14.03.2017 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 2
14.03.2017 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 16
14.03.2017 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
14.03.2017 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
14.03.2017 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
14.03.2017 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
14.03.2017 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
14.03.2017 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
14.02.2017 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
20.12.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
20.12.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.12.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.12.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.12.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
14.12.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
14.12.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
14.12.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Opposition 1
14.12.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Opposition 4
13.12.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
13.12.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
13.12.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
02.12.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.12.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
29.11.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
29.11.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
29.11.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
12.10.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.10.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
07.10.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
07.10.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
07.10.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
07.10.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
07.10.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
07.10.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
22.08.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
22.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.08.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
13.08.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
11.08.2016 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
09.08.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
08.08.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
02.08.2016 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
01.08.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
01.08.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
01.08.2016 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
01.08.2016 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 10
01.08.2016 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
01.08.2016 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
01.08.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
01.08.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
01.08.2016 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.06.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.06.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.06.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
14.06.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
14.06.2016 Request for acceleration of the opposition procedure Opposition 2
02.05.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
02.05.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.04.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
25.04.2016 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
25.04.2016 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
25.04.2016 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
25.04.2016 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
25.04.2016 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
25.04.2016 Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure Opposition 1
25.04.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
25.04.2016 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
25.04.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
25.04.2016 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
25.04.2016 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 33
21.03.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.03.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.03.2016 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
15.03.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
15.03.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
15.03.2016 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
21.01.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.01.2016 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
21.01.2016 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
14.01.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
14.01.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
14.01.2016 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
14.09.2015 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
14.09.2015 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
14.09.2015 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
08.09.2015 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
01.09.2015 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
01.09.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
18.08.2015 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
10.08.2015 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
05.08.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
05.08.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
05.08.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
05.08.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
05.08.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
05.08.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
05.08.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
05.08.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
05.08.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 34
05.08.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
05.08.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 77
05.08.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
05.08.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 3
05.08.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
05.08.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
05.08.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
05.08.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
05.08.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
05.08.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
05.08.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
05.08.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 250
05.08.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
05.08.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
05.08.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
05.08.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
05.08.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
05.08.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
05.08.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
05.08.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 5
05.08.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
05.08.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
05.08.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
05.08.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
05.08.2015 Notice of opposition Opposition 17
05.08.2015 Notice of opposition Opposition 9
04.08.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
04.08.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
04.08.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
04.08.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
04.08.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
04.08.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
04.08.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
04.08.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
04.08.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
04.08.2015 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
04.08.2015 Notice of opposition Opposition 19
04.08.2015 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
04.08.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 55
04.08.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 77
04.08.2015 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 147
05.11.2014 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
09.10.2014 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 3
26.09.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
26.09.2014 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
26.09.2014 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
26.09.2014 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
26.09.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
13.08.2014 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
17.07.2014 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
11.07.2014 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 6
11.07.2014 Request for transfer of rights - applicant Search / examination 1
27.05.2014 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
27.05.2014 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
27.05.2014 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
27.05.2014 Text intended for grant Search / examination 75
27.05.2014 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 71
27.05.2014 Text intended for grant (sequence listing) Search / examination 11
31.03.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
31.03.2014 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
31.03.2014 Claims Search / examination 2
31.03.2014 Description Search / examination 2
31.03.2014 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
27.03.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
27.03.2014 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
27.03.2014 Claims Search / examination 2
27.03.2014 Description Search / examination 2
27.03.2014 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
14.01.2014 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
14.01.2014 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
08.08.2013 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
02.08.2013 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
31.07.2013 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
10.05.2013 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
10.05.2013 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
10.05.2013 Claims Search / examination 2
10.05.2013 Description Search / examination 2
10.05.2013 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
09.01.2013 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
09.01.2013 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
28.09.2012 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
10.06.2011 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 6
10.06.2011 Description Search / examination 6
10.06.2011 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
09.06.2011 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 6
09.06.2011 Cover sheet for fax transmission Search / examination 1
09.06.2011 Description Search / examination 6
09.06.2011 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
11.02.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
11.02.2011 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
13.10.2010 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
07.10.2010 Letter filed before dispatch of the 1st communication from the Examining Division(examination procedure) Search / examination 1
22.09.2010 Communication regarding comments on Written Opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
07.09.2010 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
07.09.2010 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
07.09.2010 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
07.09.2010 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
07.09.2010 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
07.09.2010 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
07.09.2010 Non-scannable object Search / examination 1
07.09.2010 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 7
07.09.2010 Sequence listing Search / examination 10
03.09.2010 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
03.09.2010 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
03.09.2010 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
03.09.2010 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
03.09.2010 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 6
03.09.2010 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 7
03.09.2010 Sequence listing Search / examination 10
25.08.2010 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 5
18.06.2010 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
03.09.2009 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 74
13.08.2009 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
13.08.2009 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 73
13.08.2009 Sequence listing Search / examination 11
18.06.2009 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
18.06.2009 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
18.06.2009 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
27.04.2009 Notification of the recording of a change International Searching Authority 1
27.04.2009 Notification of the recording of a change International Searching Authority 1
27.04.2009 Notification of the recording of a change International Searching Authority 1
27.04.2009 Notification of the recording of a change International Searching Authority 1
16.02.2009 Abstract International Searching Authority 1
16.02.2009 Claims International Searching Authority 3
16.02.2009 Description International Searching Authority 63
16.02.2009 Drawings International Searching Authority 5