Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2247752


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
13.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.11.2017  [2017/46]
08.09.2017 Change - lapse in a contracting state published on  11.10.2017  [2017/41]
01.09.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.10.2017  [2017/40]
25.08.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.09.2017  [2017/39]
04.08.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.09.2017  [2017/36]
30.06.2017 Opposition rejected published on  02.08.2017  [2017/31]
13.03.2017 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
13.03.2017 New entry: Despatch of communication that opposition is rejected
16.12.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.01.2017  [2017/03]
31.07.2016 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
26.04.2016 New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
16.03.2016 Change: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
18.01.2016 Change: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
15.01.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  17.02.2016  [2016/07]
09.10.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.11.2015  [2015/46]
25.09.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.10.2015  [2015/44]
13.09.2015 New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
14.08.2015 Opposition filed published on  16.09.2015  [2015/38]
07.08.2015 Opposition filed published on  09.09.2015  [2015/37]
31.07.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  02.09.2015  [2015/36]
24.07.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.08.2015  [2015/35]
22.05.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.06.2015  [2015/26]
08.05.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.06.2015  [2015/24]
01.05.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.06.2015  [2015/23]
24.04.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.05.2015  [2015/22]
17.04.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.05.2015  [2015/21]
10.04.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.05.2015  [2015/20]
10.10.2014 (Expected) grant published on  05.11.2014  [2014/45]
02.10.2014 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
02.10.2014 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
30.09.2014 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
18.07.2014 Change - applicant published on  20.08.2014  [2014/34]
26.05.2014 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
03.04.2014 New entry: Reply to examination report
15.02.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
13.01.2014 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
09.08.2013 Change - representative published on  11.09.2013  [2013/37]
15.05.2013 New entry: Reply to examination report
20.03.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
08.01.2013 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
21.02.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
17.06.2011 New entry: Reply to examination report
08.04.2011 Change - extension states published on  11.05.2011  [2011/19]
18.02.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
11.02.2011 First examination report published on  16.03.2011  [2011/11]
08.02.2011 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
08.10.2010 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  10.11.2010  [2010/45]
08.10.2010 Request for examination filed published on  10.11.2010  [2010/45]
06.10.2010 PCT data prior to European publication
13.09.2010 PCT data prior to European publication
13.09.2010 Amendment by applicant
04.09.2009 PCT data prior to European publication
14.08.2009 PCT data prior to European publication