Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP2247752

Designated contracting states AT 
 BE 
 BGLapse: 05.11.2014
 CH 
CYLapse: 05.11.2014
 CZ 
 DE 
 DK 
 EELapse: 05.11.2014
 ES 
 FI 
 FR 
 GB 
 GRLapse: 06.02.2015
 HRLapse: 05.11.2014
 HULapse: 04.02.2009
 IELapse: 04.02.2015
 ISLapse: 05.03.2015
 IT 
LI 
 LTLapse: 05.11.2014
 LULapse: 04.02.2015
LVLapse: 05.11.2014
 MCLapse: 05.11.2014
 MK 
MTLapse: 05.11.2014
 NL 
 NOLapse: 05.02.2015
 PL 
 PTLapse: 05.03.2015
 ROLapse: 05.11.2014
 SE 
 SI 
 SK 
 TRLapse: 05.11.2014
Examination procedure26.09.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Entry into regional phase03.09.2010National basic fee paid 
03.09.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
03.09.2010Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
15.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
12.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
12.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
European patent granted05.11.2014
Opposition procedure14.03.2017Date of despatch of rejection of opposition 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:10.11.2010 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20100903
 
Event date:10.11.2010 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
 
Event date:10.11.2010 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Countries concerned:AL BA RS
 
Event date:16.03.2011 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT
Effective DATE:20110211
 
Event date:11.05.2011 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)
 
Event date:25.06.2014 
Event description:ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT
Effective DATE:20140527
 
Event date:20.08.2014 
Event description:TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION
Owner Name:MASSACHUSETTS GENERAL HOSPITAL
 
Event date:20.08.2014 
Event description:TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION
Owner Name:THE CURATORS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF MISSOURI
 
Event date:20.08.2014 
Event description:TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION
Owner Name:MASSACHUSETTS INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY
 
Event date:05.11.2014 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
 
Event date:05.11.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
 
Event date:14.11.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH EP
Code Expl.:+ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE
 
Event date:15.11.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT REF 694695 AT T
Code Expl.:+REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)
Effective DATE:20141115
 
Event date:03.12.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND
 
Event date:18.12.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R096 602009027552 DE
Code Expl.:+DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT
Effective DATE:20141218
 
Event date:02.02.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DK T3
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT
Effective DATE:20150127
 
Event date:13.02.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH NV
Code Expl.: NEW AGENT
Representatives Name:ISLER AND PEDRAZZINI AG, CH
 
Event date:17.02.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SE TRGR
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT
 
Event date:18.02.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG NL T3
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995
 
Event date:20.02.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FG2A 2529465 ES T3
Code Expl.:+DEFINITIVE PROTECTION
Effective DATE:20150220
 
Event date:27.04.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG LT MG4D
Code Expl.:-INVALIDATED EUROPEAN PATENT
 
Event date:30.04.2015 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:IS
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20150305
 
Event date:30.04.2015 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:NO
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20150205
 
Event date:30.04.2015 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:LT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20141105
 
Event date:30.04.2015 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:PT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20150305
 
Event date:29.05.2015 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:HR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20141105
 
Event date:29.05.2015 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:CY
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20141105
 
Event date:29.05.2015 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:GR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20150206
 
Event date:29.05.2015 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:LV
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20141105
 
Event date:31.07.2015 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:RO
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20141105
 
Event date:31.07.2015 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:EE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20141105
 
Event date:31.07.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG PL T3
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT
 
Event date:04.08.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R026 602009027552 DE
Code Expl.:-OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST PATENT
 
Event date:09.09.2015 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED
Opponent Name:KRAUSS, JAN
Effective DATE:20150804
 
Event date:16.09.2015 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED
Opponent Name:GENEFAST S.R.L.
Effective DATE:20150805
 
Event date:30.09.2015 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:LU
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20150204
 
Event date:02.10.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SK T3 E 18857 SK
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT SPECIFICATION INTO SLOVAKIAN
 
Event date:30.10.2015 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:MC
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20141105
 
Event date:18.11.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG IE MM4A
Code Expl.:-PATENT LAPSED
 
Event date:08.01.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:8
 
Event date:29.01.2016 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:IE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20150204
 
Event date:15.05.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG AT UEP 694695 AT T
Code Expl.:+PUBLICATION OF TRANSLATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT SPECIFICATION
Effective DATE:20141105
 
Event date:30.12.2016 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:MT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20141105
 
Event date:14.02.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R100 602009027552 DE
Code Expl.:+EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT UNAMENDED NOW FINAL
 
Event date:13.04.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:9
 
Event date:31.05.2017 
Event description:POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE
Ref Country Code:AT
Payment DATE:20170410
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:31.05.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:BG
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20141105
 
Event date:31.05.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:HU
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT; INVALID AB INITIO
Effective DATE:20090204
 
Event date:30.06.2017 
Event description:POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE
Ref Country Code:NL
Payment DATE:20170412
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:31.07.2017 
Event description:POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE
Ref Country Code:CH
Payment DATE:20170412
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:31.07.2017 
Event description:POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20170412
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:31.07.2017 
Event description:POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20170413
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:31.07.2017 
Event description:POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20170411
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:31.07.2017 
Event description:POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE
Ref Country Code:SK
Payment DATE:20170412
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:31.07.2017 
Event description:POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE
Ref Country Code:CZ
Payment DATE:20170412
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:31.07.2017 
Event description:POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE
Ref Country Code:DK
Payment DATE:20170411
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:02.08.2017 
Event description:OPPOSITION REJECTED
Effective DATE:20170214
 
Event date:31.08.2017 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO
Ref Country Code:TR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT
Effective DATE:20141105
 
Event date:31.08.2017 
Event description:POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE
Ref Country Code:PL
Payment DATE:20170413
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:31.08.2017 
Event description:POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE
Ref Country Code:SI
Payment DATE:20170412
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:31.08.2017 
Event description:POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE
Ref Country Code:SE
Payment DATE:20170411
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:31.08.2017 
Event description:POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE
Ref Country Code:ES
Payment DATE:20170427
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:31.08.2017 
Event description:POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE
Ref Country Code:IT
Payment DATE:20170420
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:31.08.2017 
Event description:POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE
Ref Country Code:FI
Payment DATE:20170410
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:31.08.2017 
Event description:POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE
Ref Country Code:BE
Payment DATE:20170413
Year of Fee Payment:09
 
Event date:21.12.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:10