Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2247752

EP2247752 - PREDICTION AND DIAGNOSIS OF CANINE DEGENERATIVE MYELOPATHY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2010/45]PREDICTION AND DIAGNOSIS OF CANINE DEGENERATIVE MYELOPATHY
[2014/45]
StatusOpposition rejected
Status updated on  30.06.2017
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  13.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip13.10.2017Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 15.11.2017  [2017/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Curators of The University of Missouri
615 Locust Street Building, 3rd Floor
Columbia, MO 65211 / US
For all designated states
Massachusetts Institute of Technology
77 Massachusetts Avenue
Cambridge, MA 02139 / US
For all designated states
Massachusetts General Hospital
55 Fruit Street
Boston, MA 02114 / US
[2014/45]
Former [2014/34]For all designated states
The Curators of The University of Missouri
615 Locust Street Building, 3rd Floor
Columbia, MO 65211 / US
For all designated states
Massachusetts Institute of Technology
77 Massachusetts Avenue
Cambridge, MA 02139 / US
For all designated states
Massachusetts General Hospital
55 Fruit Street
Boston, MA 02114 / US
Former [2010/45]For all designated states
The Curators Of The University Of Missouri
615 Locust Street Building 3rd Floor
Columbia, MO 65211 / US
Inventor(s)01 / COATES, Joan, R
615 Locust St. Bldg
3rd Floor
Columbia MO 65211 / US
02 / LINBLAD-TOH, Kerstin
90 Cherry Street
Malden MA 02148 / US
03 / WADE, Claire
41 Bonnet Ave
Como NSW 2226 / AU
04 / JOHNSON, Gary, S.
615 Locust St. Bldg
3rd Floor
Columbia MO 65211 / US
 [2014/45]
Former [2010/45]01 / COATES, Joan, R
615 Locust St. Bldg 3rd Floor
Columbia MO 65211 / US
02 / LINBLAD-TOH, Kerstin
90 Cherry Street
Malden MA 02148 / US
03 / WADE, Claire
41 Bonnet Ave
Como NSW 2226 / AU
04 / JOHNSON, Gary, S.
615 Locust St. Bldg 3rd Floor
Columbia MO 65211 / US
Representative(s)Potter Clarkson LLP
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/45]Potter Clarkson LLP
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham, NG1 5GG / GB
Former [2013/37]Potter Clarkson LLP
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham
NG1 5GG / GB
Former [2010/45]Wright, Andrew John
Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk
Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB
Application number, filing date09708938.704.02.2009
[2014/45]
WO2009US33091
Priority number, dateUS2008002594904.02.2008         Original published format: US 25949
[2010/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009100141
Date:13.08.2009
Language:EN
[2009/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2247752
Date:10.11.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.08.2009
[2010/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2247752
Date:05.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/45]
Search report(s)International search reportEP13.08.2009
ClassificationInternational:C12Q1/68
[2010/45]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/45]
TitleGerman:VORHERSAGE UND DIAGNOSE VON DEGENERATIVER MYELOPATHIE BEI HUNDEN[2014/45]
English:PREDICTION AND DIAGNOSIS OF CANINE DEGENERATIVE MYELOPATHY[2014/45]
French:PRÉDICTION ET DIAGNOSTIC DE LA MYÉLOPATHIE DÉGÉNÉRATIVE CANINE[2014/45]
Former [2010/45]VORHERSAGE UND DIAGNOSE VON DEGENERATIVER MYELOPATHIE BEI HUNDEN
Former [2010/45]PREDICTION AND DIAGNOSIS OF CANINE DEGENERATIVE MYELOPATHY
Former [2010/45]PRÉDICTION ET DIAGNOSTIC DE LA MYÉLOPATHIE DÉGÉNÉRATIVE CANINE
Entry into regional phase03.09.2010National basic fee paid 
03.09.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
03.09.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.09.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.09.2010Examination requested  [2010/45]
11.02.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.06.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.01.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.05.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.01.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.03.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.05.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.09.2014Fee for grant paid
26.09.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
26.09.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  11.02.2011
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  04.08.2015  12.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Krauss, Jan
Boehmert & Boehmert
Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
 02  05.08.2015   
Genefast s.r.l.
Via Castelfranco, 17/D
40053 Bazzano (BO) / IT
Opponent's representative
Robba, Pierpaolo
Interpatent S.R.L.
Via Caboto, 35
10129 Torino / IT
 [N/P]
Former [2015/38]
Opponent(s)01  04.08.2015  12.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Krauss, Jan
Boehmert & Boehmert
Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
 02  05.08.2015   
Genefast s.r.l.
Via Castelfranco, 17/D
40053 Bazzano (BO) / IT
Opponent's representative
Robba, Pierpaolo
Interpatent S.R.L.
Via Caboto 35
10129 Torino / IT
Former [2015/37]
Opponent(s)01  04.08.2015   
Krauss, Jan
Boehmert & Boehmert
Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
14.09.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
25.04.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
14.02.2017Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2017/31]
14.02.2017Date of oral proceedings
14.03.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
14.03.2017Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 03
15.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 04
12.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 05
12.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU04.02.2009
BG05.11.2014
CY05.11.2014
EE05.11.2014
HR05.11.2014
LT05.11.2014
LV05.11.2014
MC05.11.2014
MT05.11.2014
RO05.11.2014
TR05.11.2014
IE04.02.2015
LU04.02.2015
NO05.02.2015
GR06.02.2015
IS05.03.2015
PT05.03.2015
[2017/41]
Former [2017/39]HU04.02.2009
BG05.11.2014
CY05.11.2014
EE05.11.2014
HR05.11.2014
LT05.11.2014
LV05.11.2014
MC05.11.2014
MT05.11.2014
RO05.11.2014
TR05.11.2014
IE04.02.2015
LU04.02.2015
NO05.02.2015
GR06.02.2015
IS05.03.2015
PT05.03.2015
Former [2017/36]HU04.02.2009
BG05.11.2014
CY05.11.2014
EE05.11.2014
HR05.11.2014
LT05.11.2014
LV05.11.2014
MC05.11.2014
MT05.11.2014
RO05.11.2014
IE04.02.2015
LU04.02.2015
NO05.02.2015
GR06.02.2015
IS05.03.2015
PT05.03.2015
Former [2017/03]CY05.11.2014
EE05.11.2014
HR05.11.2014
LT05.11.2014
LV05.11.2014
MC05.11.2014
MT05.11.2014
RO05.11.2014
IE04.02.2015
LU04.02.2015
NO05.02.2015
GR06.02.2015
IS05.03.2015
PT05.03.2015
Former [2016/07]CY05.11.2014
EE05.11.2014
HR05.11.2014
LT05.11.2014
LV05.11.2014
MC05.11.2014
RO05.11.2014
IE04.02.2015
LU04.02.2015
NO05.02.2015
GR06.02.2015
IS05.03.2015
PT05.03.2015
Former [2015/46]CY05.11.2014
EE05.11.2014
HR05.11.2014
LT05.11.2014
LV05.11.2014
MC05.11.2014
RO05.11.2014
LU04.02.2015
NO05.02.2015
GR06.02.2015
IS05.03.2015
PT05.03.2015
Former [2015/44]CY05.11.2014
EE05.11.2014
HR05.11.2014
LT05.11.2014
LV05.11.2014
RO05.11.2014
LU04.02.2015
NO05.02.2015
GR06.02.2015
IS05.03.2015
PT05.03.2015
Former [2015/36]CY05.11.2014
EE05.11.2014
HR05.11.2014
LT05.11.2014
LV05.11.2014
RO05.11.2014
NO05.02.2015
GR06.02.2015
IS05.03.2015
PT05.03.2015
Former [2015/35]CY05.11.2014
EE05.11.2014
HR05.11.2014
LT05.11.2014
LV05.11.2014
NO05.02.2015
GR06.02.2015
IS05.03.2015
PT05.03.2015
Former [2015/26]CY05.11.2014
HR05.11.2014
LT05.11.2014
LV05.11.2014
NO05.02.2015
GR06.02.2015
IS05.03.2015
PT05.03.2015
Former [2015/24]HR05.11.2014
LT05.11.2014
LV05.11.2014
NO05.02.2015
GR06.02.2015
IS05.03.2015
PT05.03.2015
Former [2015/23]LT05.11.2014
NO05.02.2015
IS05.03.2015
PT05.03.2015
Former [2015/22]LT05.11.2014
NO05.02.2015
PT05.03.2015
Former [2015/21]LT05.11.2014
NO05.02.2015
Former [2015/20]LT05.11.2014
Cited inInternational search[PX]  - AWANO TOMOYUKI ET AL, "Genome-wide association analysis reveals a SOD1 mutation in canine degenerative myelopathy that resembles amyotrophic lateral sclerosis.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA 24 FEB 2009, (20090224), vol. 106, no. 8, ISSN 1091-6490, pages 2794 - 2799, XP002527026 [PX] 1-16 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0812297106
 [PX]  - JOHNSON ET AL, "A SOD1 missense mutation in dogs with degenerative myelopathy: a spontaneous amyotrophic lateral sclerosis model", (200811), page 1, URL: http://www.ashg.org/2008meeting/abstracts/fulltext/f20625.htm, (20090506), XP002527027 [PX] 1-16 * the whole document *
 [PX]  - O`BRIEN ET AL, "SOD1 immunoreactivity in a spontaneous canine model of amyotrophic lateral sclerosis (ALS)", (2008), page 1, URL: http://som.missouri.edu/ophthalmology/Faculty/katz-m/DM%20SOD1%20immuno%20SFN%2011-08%20MK%20B.pdf, (20090506), XP002527028 [PX] 1-16 * the whole document *
 [DA]  - SANDELIN ERIK ET AL, "Amyotrophic lateral sclerosis-associated copper/zinc superoxide dismutase mutations preferentially reduce the repulsive charge of the proteins.", THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY 20 JUL 2007, (20070720), vol. 282, no. 29, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 21230 - 21236, XP002527029 [DA] 1-16 * the whole document * * figures 1,4 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.m700765200
 [A]  - GREEN S L ET AL, "Structure, chromosomal location, and analysis of the canine Cu/Zn superoxide dismutase (SOD1) gene", JOURNAL OF HEREDITY 2002 US, (2002), vol. 93, no. 2, ISSN 0022-1503, pages 119 - 124, XP002527030 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * * page 123, columns 1-2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/jhered/93.2.119
 [A]  - VENTURA DOG BLOG, "Interesting Information on Degenerative Myelopathy", (2007), page 1, URL: http://venturahomesfordogs.blogspot.com/2007/10/interesting-information-on-degenerative.html, (20090506), XP002527031 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * * paragraph [0001] *