EP1017167 - Acoustic characteristic correction device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.12.2004 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.01.2005 [2005/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YAMAHA CORPORATION 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/27] | For all designated states YAMAHA CORPORATION 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Emoto, Naohiro c/o Yamaha Corporation, 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | 02 /
Ito, Tsugio c/o Yamaha Corporation, 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | [2000/27] | Representative(s) | Geyer, Ulrich F., et al Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/27] | Geyer, Ulrich F., Dr. Dipl.-Phys., et al WAGNER & GEYER, Patentanwälte, Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00100108.0 | 10.05.1994 | [2000/27] | Priority number, date | JP19930132756 | 11.05.1993 Original published format: JP 13275693 | JP19930198977 | 16.07.1993 Original published format: JP 19897793 | JP19930257596 | 21.09.1993 Original published format: JP 25759693 | JP19930207281 | 29.07.1993 Original published format: JP 20728193 | JP19930201766 | 22.07.1993 Original published format: JP 20176693 | JP19930201765 | 22.07.1993 Original published format: JP 20176593 | [2000/44] |
Former [2000/27] | JP19930132756 | 11.05.1993 | |
JP19930198977 | 16.07.1993 | ||
JP19930257596 | 21.09.1993 | ||
JP19930207821 | 29.07.1993 | ||
JP19930201766 | 22.07.1993 | ||
JP19930201765 | 22.07.1993 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1017167 | Date: | 05.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1017167 | Date: | 23.05.2001 | [2001/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1017167 | Date: | 04.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04S7/00 | [2001/21] | CPC: |
H04S7/40 (EP,US);
H03G5/165 (EP,US);
H04S7/301 (EP,US);
H04R29/001 (EP,US);
H04S7/305 (EP,US);
H04S7/307 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/27] | H03G5/16 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/27] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Veränderung akustischer Eigenschaften | [2000/27] | English: | Acoustic characteristic correction device | [2000/27] | French: | Dispositif de correction des caractéristiques acoustiques | [2000/27] | Examination procedure | 04.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/27] | 15.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.11.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 25.11.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP94107305.8 / EP0624947 | Opposition(s) | 05.11.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5040220 (IWAMATSU MASAYUKI [JP]) [X] 1 * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 30; figures 1,3,4; claim 1 *; | [A]US4458362 (BERKOVITZ ROBERT A [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 3, line 35 - column 5, line 11; figure 2 * |