EP1022293 - Copolymers and their use as additives for improving cold flow properties of middle distillates [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.06.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2019 | Change - classification | published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Clariant GmbH Brüningstrasse 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2000/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Krull, Matthias, Dr. Elsenbruch 3b 46147 Oberhausen / DE | 02 /
Nagel, Waltraud Dragoner Strasse 29 46147 Oberhausen / DE | [2000/30] | Application number, filing date | 00100333.4 | 07.01.2000 | [2000/30] | Priority number, date | DE19991001803 | 19.01.1999 Original published format: DE 19901803 | [2000/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1022293 | Date: | 26.07.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1022293 | Date: | 13.11.2002 | [2002/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1022293 | Date: | 11.08.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | C08F255/00, C08F222/06, C10L1/18 | [2000/30] | CPC: |
C10L1/146 (EP,US);
C08F210/00 (KR);
C08F255/00 (EP,US);
C08F255/10 (EP,US);
C08L51/003 (EP,US);
C08L51/06 (EP,US);
C10L1/1966 (EP,US);
C08F222/145 (EP,KR,US);
C10L1/1963 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08L51/003, C08L2666/02 (EP,US);
C08L51/06, C08L2666/02 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, NL, PT [2004/19] |
Former [2000/30] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Copolymere und ihre Verwendung als Additiv zur Verbesserung der Kaltfliesseigenschaften von Mitteldestillaten | [2000/30] | English: | Copolymers and their use as additives for improving cold flow properties of middle distillates | [2000/30] | French: | Copolymères et leur utilisation pour l'amélioration des propriétés d'écoulement à froid des distillats moyens | [2000/30] | Examination procedure | 13.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/28] | 29.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP04016616.7 / EP1469019 | Opposition(s) | 12.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [2007/34] | IT | 07.01.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4330971 (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1-9 * page 2, line 40 - line 66 *; | [A]DE19508656 (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1-9 * claim - *; | [A]US5733993 (YU DANIEL Y F [US], et al) [A] 1-9* claim - * |