EP1022634 - Cartridge for sanitary fittings [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.09.2010 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 31.10.2012 [2012/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hansgrohe AG Auestrasse 5 - 9 77761 Schiltach / DE | [2000/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lorch, Werner Am Hammergraben 84/1 78713 Schramberg / DE | [2000/30] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner mbB Postfach 10 40 36 70035 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/30] | Patentanwälte Ruff, Beier, Schöndorf und Mütschele Willy-Brandt-Strasse 28 70173 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 00100534.7 | 12.01.2000 | [2000/30] | Priority number, date | DE1999101851 | 19.01.1999 Original published format: DE 19901851 | [2000/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1022634 | Date: | 26.07.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1022634 | Date: | 11.11.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G05D23/13 | [2000/30] | CPC: |
G05D23/1353 (EP,US);
Y10T137/5109 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/30] | Extension states | SI | 22.08.2000 | Title | German: | Kartusche für Sanitärarmaturen | [2000/30] | English: | Cartridge for sanitary fittings | [2000/30] | French: | Cartouche pour robinetterie sanitaire | [2000/30] | Examination procedure | 22.08.2000 | Examination requested [2000/42] | 21.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.09.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 28.09.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 11.11.2009 | DK | 11.11.2009 | FI | 11.11.2009 | IE | 11.11.2009 | IT | 11.11.2009 | NL | 11.11.2009 | SE | 11.11.2009 | AT | 12.01.2010 | LU | 12.01.2010 | BE | 31.01.2010 | CH | 31.01.2010 | LI | 31.01.2010 | MC | 31.01.2010 | FR | 01.02.2010 | GB | 11.02.2010 | GR | 12.02.2010 | ES | 22.02.2010 | PT | 11.03.2010 | [2012/44] |
Former [2012/43] | CY | 11.11.2009 | |
DK | 11.11.2009 | ||
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
IE | 11.11.2009 | ||
IT | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
AT | 12.01.2010 | ||
LU | 12.01.2010 | ||
BE | 31.01.2010 | ||
CH | 31.01.2010 | ||
LI | 31.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
FR | 01.02.2010 | ||
GB | 11.02.2010 | ||
GR | 12.02.2010 | ||
ES | 22.02.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/31] | CY | 11.11.2009 | |
DK | 11.11.2009 | ||
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
IE | 11.11.2009 | ||
IT | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
AT | 12.01.2010 | ||
BE | 31.01.2010 | ||
CH | 31.01.2010 | ||
LI | 31.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
FR | 01.02.2010 | ||
GB | 11.02.2010 | ||
GR | 12.02.2010 | ||
ES | 22.02.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/17] | CY | 11.11.2009 | |
DK | 11.11.2009 | ||
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
IE | 11.11.2009 | ||
IT | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
BE | 31.01.2010 | ||
CH | 31.01.2010 | ||
LI | 31.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
FR | 01.02.2010 | ||
GB | 11.02.2010 | ||
GR | 12.02.2010 | ||
ES | 22.02.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/14] | CY | 11.11.2009 | |
DK | 11.11.2009 | ||
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
IE | 11.11.2009 | ||
IT | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
BE | 31.01.2010 | ||
CH | 31.01.2010 | ||
LI | 31.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
FR | 01.02.2010 | ||
GR | 12.02.2010 | ||
ES | 22.02.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/13] | CY | 11.11.2009 | |
DK | 11.11.2009 | ||
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
IE | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
BE | 31.01.2010 | ||
CH | 31.01.2010 | ||
LI | 31.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
FR | 01.02.2010 | ||
GR | 12.02.2010 | ||
ES | 22.02.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/47] | CY | 11.11.2009 | |
DK | 11.11.2009 | ||
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
IE | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2010 | ||
LI | 31.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
FR | 01.02.2010 | ||
GR | 12.02.2010 | ||
ES | 22.02.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/37] | CY | 11.11.2009 | |
DK | 11.11.2009 | ||
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
IE | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
ES | 22.02.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | CY | 11.11.2009 | |
DK | 11.11.2009 | ||
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
IE | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
ES | 22.02.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/25] | CY | 11.11.2009 | |
FI | 11.11.2009 | ||
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
ES | 22.02.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/22] | FI | 11.11.2009 | |
SE | 11.11.2009 | ||
ES | 22.02.2010 | ||
PT | 11.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/19] | ES | 22.02.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2804803 (HANSA METALLWERKE AG) [A] 1-9* page 15, paragraph 5 - page 16, paragraph 1; figures 1,2 *; | [A]CH648390 (ANTON J WILLI) [A] 1-9 * claims 1-4; tables 1,2 *; | [A]EP0560737 (GALATRON SRL [IT]) [A] 1-9 * column 4, line 37 - line 49; figures 1-6 *; | [X]US5340018 (MACDONALD ROBERT [US]) [X] 1,3-9 * column 8, line 16 - column 9, line 16; figures 1-5 *; | [X]WO9835280 (MEC RUGA OSVALDO OFF [IT], et al) [X] 1,3-9 * page 6, line 26 - page 7, line 31; figures 1-7 * |