EP1020427 - Agent for potentiating nerve growth factor activity containing 1,2-ethanediol derivative or salt thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.08.2004 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 23.09.2009 [2009/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYAMA CHEMICAL CO., LTD. 2-5, 3-chome, Nishishinjuku, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-0023 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/29] | For all designated states TOYAMA CHEMICAL CO., LTD. 2-5, 3-chome, Nishishinjuku, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-0023 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ono, Satoshi 2-5, Nakajima-3-chome Toyama-shi, Toyama 930 / JP | 02 /
Maekawa, Mutsuko 65-5, Shimokumano Toyama-shi, Toyama 939 / JP | 03 /
Narita, Hirokazu 6-40, Okudahonmachi Toyama-shi, Toyama 930 / JP | 04 /
Hirata, Kazunari 80-59, Ota Toyama-shi, Toyama 939 / JP | [2000/29] | Representative(s) | Wächtershäuser, Günter, et al Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwälte Ottostrasse 4 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/39] | Wächtershäuser, Günter, et al Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwälte Weinstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/29] | Wächtershäuser, Günter, Prof. Dr., et al Wächtershäuser & Hartz, Patentanwälte, Tal 29 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00100580.0 | 20.10.1995 | [2000/29] | Priority number, date | JP19940284272 | 25.10.1994 Original published format: JP 28427294 | JP19940284273 | 25.10.1994 Original published format: JP 28427394 | [2000/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1020427 | Date: | 19.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1020427 | Date: | 01.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C07C217/10, C07D333/54, C07D307/79, C07D409/12, C07D471/08 | [2000/29] | CPC: |
C07D307/79 (EP,KR,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07C217/10 (EP,KR,US);
C07D333/54 (EP,KR,US);
C07D409/12 (EP,KR,US);
C07D453/02 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [2000/29] | Title | German: | Ein Wirkstoff für die Forderung von Nervwachstumfaktor Aktivität, der ein 1,2-Ethandiol-Derivat oder ein Salz davon enthält | [2000/29] | English: | Agent for potentiating nerve growth factor activity containing 1,2-ethanediol derivative or salt thereof | [2000/29] | French: | Un agent pour la potentiation de l'activité de la facteur de la croissance du nerf, qui contient la 1,2-éthanediol ou un de ses dérivés | [2000/29] | Examination procedure | 12.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/29] | 15.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.07.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 09.07.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP95934859.0 / EP0790246 | Divisional application(s) | EP02004782.5 / EP1223169 | Opposition(s) | 02.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 09.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0383281 (TOYAMA CHEMICAL CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-19* page 2, line 1 - line 26; example -; claim - * |