EP1020370 - Sorting magazine for the supply of loose small parts [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 11.07.2008 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YKK Europe Limited 61 Central Street London EC1V 8AN / GB | [2004/32] |
Former [2000/29] | For all designated states STOCKO Fasteners GmbH Kirchhofstrasse 52 42327 Wuppertal / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Reich, Holger Lüttringhauser Strasse 146 42369 Wuppertal / DE | [2000/29] | Representative(s) | Leinweber & Zimmermann Patentanwalts-PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Viktualienmarkt 8 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Leinweber & Zimmermann European Patent Attorneys Patentanwälte Rosental 7 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/29] | Patentanwälte Leinweber & Zimmermann Rosental 7 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00100663.4 | 13.01.2000 | [2000/29] | Priority number, date | DE19991001439 | 15.01.1999 Original published format: DE 19901439 | [2004/25] |
Former [2000/29] | DE19991001439 | 13.01.1999 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1020370 | Date: | 19.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1020370 | Date: | 16.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B65D47/14 | [2000/29] | CPC: |
B07C5/38 (EP,US);
B65G47/1407 (EP,US);
B65G47/1478 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, PT [2001/14] |
Former [2000/29] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Sortiermagazin für die Bevorratung loser Kleinteile | [2000/29] | English: | Sorting magazine for the supply of loose small parts | [2000/29] | French: | Trieuse pour l' approvisionnement de petites pièces individuelles | [2003/38] |
Former [2000/29] | Magazin de tri pour l' approvisionnement de petites pièces sèparées | Examination procedure | 15.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/11] | 26.11.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.04.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 01.04.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
14.03.2005
21.03.2005
ADMISSIBLE William Prym GmbH & Co. KG Zweifaller Strasse 130 D-52224 Stolberg / DE Opponent's representative Brötz, Helmut Rieder & Partner mbB Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwalt Yale-Allee 26 42329 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/19] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
14.03.2005
21.03.2005
ADMISSIBLE William Prym GmbH & Co. KG Zweifaller Strasse 130 D-52224 Stolberg / DE Opponent's representative Brötz, Helmut, Dr. Rieder & Partner, Corneliusstrasse 45 42329 Wuppertal / DE | 21.04.2005 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 16.08.2005 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 11.10.2007 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 13.11.2007 | 11.10.2007 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 13.11.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 25.03.2008 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 04.04.2008 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2008/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2003 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   30.06.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 13.01.2008 | ES | 14.01.2008 | [2020/33] |
Former [2009/37] | IT | 13.01.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5005752 (OBST FRANK [DE]) [A] 1-7 * column 2, line 57 - column 4, line 9 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US5815914 (KAMPS ROLF [DE], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 46 - column 4, line 49 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US5603442 (SCHMIDT VOLKER [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 4, line 9 - column 6, line 48 * * figures 1-10 *; | [A]GB841093 (PFAFF AG G M) [A] 1 * page 2, line 84 - page 3, line 95 * * figures 1-6 * | by applicant | DE19649417 |