EP1033279 - Hinge for a vehicle seat [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.04.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.05.2005 [2005/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KEIPER GmbH & Co. KG Hertelsbrunnenring 2 67657 Kaiserslautern / DE | [2004/22] |
Former [2003/16] | For all designated states KEIPER GmbH & Co.KG Hertelsbrunnenring 2 67657 Kaiserslautern / DE | ||
Former [2000/36] | For all designated states Keiper GmbH & Co. Hertelsbrunnenring 2 67657 Kaiserslautern / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kraus, Reinhard Daniel-Schürmann-Strasse 37 42853 Remscheid / DE | [2000/36] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Hosenthien-Held und Dr. Held Klopstockstrasse 63-65 70193 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/36] | Patentanwälte Hosenthien-Held und Dr. Held Klopstockstrasse 63 70193 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 00100777.2 | 15.01.2000 | [2000/36] | Priority number, date | DE1999109511 | 04.03.1999 Original published format: DE 19909511 | [2000/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1033279 | Date: | 06.09.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1033279 | Date: | 26.05.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/20 | [2000/36] | CPC: |
B60N2/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/36] | Title | German: | Beschlag für einen Fahrzeugsitz | [2000/36] | English: | Hinge for a vehicle seat | [2000/36] | French: | Articulation pour un siège de véhicule | [2000/36] | Examination procedure | 29.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/04] | 21.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 04.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE4326623 (KEIPER RECARO GMBH CO [DE]) [X] 1,4,10 * abstract * * column 4, line 46 - column 5, line 39; figures 2-5 * [A] 2,3,5-9; | [XA]EP0269348 (IHW ENG LTD [GB]) [X] 1,10 * abstract * [A] 2-4; | [A]DE19531018 (KEIPER RECARO GMBH CO [DE]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * column 5, line 16 - column 6, line 22; figures 1-6 *; | [AD]DE29615132U (KEIPER RECARO GMBH CO [DE]) [AD] 1,10 * page 7, line 20 - page 9, line 29; figures 4-6; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0469969 (FAURE BERTRAND AUTOMOBILE [FR]) [A] 1,10 * column 2, line 10 - column 3, line 43; figure 1 * |