EP1028589 - Improvements relating to television guide systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.03.2003 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 12.01.2005 [2005/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pace Micro Technology Plc Victoria Road Saltaire Shipley BD14 3LF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/33] | For all designated states Pace Micro Technology PLC Victoria Road Saltaire, Shipley, BD14 3LF / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Entwistle, Paul Kanangra, Outside Lane Oxenhope, West Yorkshire / GB | [2000/33] | Representative(s) | Wood, Graham, et al Bailey Walsh & Co LLP 1 York Place Leeds, LS1 2DR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/33] | Wood, Graham, et al Bailey Walsh & Co, 5 York Place Leeds LS1 2SD / GB | Application number, filing date | 00100857.2 | 18.01.2000 | [2000/33] | Priority number, date | GB19990003220 | 12.02.1999 Original published format: GB 9903220 | [2000/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1028589 | Date: | 16.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1028589 | Date: | 08.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/445 | [2000/33] | CPC: |
H04N21/4147 (EP,US);
H04N21/47 (EP,US);
H04N21/4312 (EP,US);
H04N21/4333 (EP,US);
H04N21/482 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/33] | Title | German: | Verbessertes Fernsehführungssystem | [2000/33] | English: | Improvements relating to television guide systems | [2000/33] | French: | Guide de télévision amélioré | [2000/33] | Examination procedure | 11.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/11] | 22.11.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.02.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 25.02.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.03.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 11.02.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.05.2002 | BE | 08.05.2002 | CH | 08.05.2002 | FI | 08.05.2002 | GR | 08.05.2002 | LI | 08.05.2002 | NL | 08.05.2002 | DK | 08.08.2002 | PT | 08.08.2002 | SE | 08.08.2002 | CY | 18.01.2003 | LU | 18.01.2003 | IE | 20.01.2003 | MC | 31.01.2003 | [2005/02] |
Former [2004/44] | AT | 08.05.2002 | |
BE | 08.05.2002 | ||
CH | 08.05.2002 | ||
FI | 08.05.2002 | ||
GR | 08.05.2002 | ||
LI | 08.05.2002 | ||
NL | 08.05.2002 | ||
DK | 08.08.2002 | ||
PT | 08.08.2002 | ||
SE | 08.08.2002 | ||
CY | 18.01.2003 | ||
LU | 18.01.2003 | ||
IE | 20.01.2003 | ||
Former [2004/40] | AT | 08.05.2002 | |
BE | 08.05.2002 | ||
CH | 08.05.2002 | ||
FI | 08.05.2002 | ||
GR | 08.05.2002 | ||
LI | 08.05.2002 | ||
NL | 08.05.2002 | ||
DK | 08.08.2002 | ||
PT | 08.08.2002 | ||
SE | 08.08.2002 | ||
LU | 18.01.2003 | ||
IE | 20.01.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 08.05.2002 | |
BE | 08.05.2002 | ||
CH | 08.05.2002 | ||
GR | 08.05.2002 | ||
LI | 08.05.2002 | ||
NL | 08.05.2002 | ||
DK | 08.08.2002 | ||
PT | 08.08.2002 | ||
SE | 08.08.2002 | ||
LU | 18.01.2003 | ||
IE | 20.01.2003 | ||
Former [2004/15] | AT | 08.05.2002 | |
BE | 08.05.2002 | ||
CH | 08.05.2002 | ||
GR | 08.05.2002 | ||
LI | 08.05.2002 | ||
NL | 08.05.2002 | ||
DK | 08.08.2002 | ||
PT | 08.08.2002 | ||
SE | 08.08.2002 | ||
IE | 20.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/48] | AT | 08.05.2002 | |
BE | 08.05.2002 | ||
CH | 08.05.2002 | ||
GR | 08.05.2002 | ||
LI | 08.05.2002 | ||
NL | 08.05.2002 | ||
DK | 08.08.2002 | ||
PT | 08.08.2002 | ||
SE | 08.08.2002 | ||
Former [2003/45] | AT | 08.05.2002 | |
CH | 08.05.2002 | ||
GR | 08.05.2002 | ||
LI | 08.05.2002 | ||
NL | 08.05.2002 | ||
DK | 08.08.2002 | ||
PT | 08.08.2002 | ||
SE | 08.08.2002 | ||
Former [2003/21] | AT | 08.05.2002 | |
CH | 08.05.2002 | ||
GR | 08.05.2002 | ||
LI | 08.05.2002 | ||
NL | 08.05.2002 | ||
PT | 08.08.2002 | ||
SE | 08.08.2002 | ||
Former [2003/20] | AT | 08.05.2002 | |
CH | 08.05.2002 | ||
GR | 08.05.2002 | ||
LI | 08.05.2002 | ||
NL | 08.05.2002 | ||
SE | 08.08.2002 | ||
Former [2003/16] | AT | 08.05.2002 | |
CH | 08.05.2002 | ||
LI | 08.05.2002 | ||
NL | 08.05.2002 | ||
SE | 08.08.2002 | ||
Former [2003/10] | AT | 08.05.2002 | |
NL | 08.05.2002 | ||
SE | 08.08.2002 | ||
Former [2003/07] | NL | 08.05.2002 | |
SE | 08.08.2002 | ||
Former [2002/46] | SE | 08.08.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4706121 (YOUNG PATRICK [US]) [A] 1,2,7 * column 19, line 49 - line 66 *; | [A]US5361173 (ISHII TOSHIYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1,2,7 * column 29, line 58 - column 31, line 68 *; | [A]US5686954 (YOSHINOBU HITOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,2,7 * column 25, line 45 - column 27, line 39 *; | [A]EP0836320 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,2,7 * column W *; | [A]US5774186 (BRODSKY MARC HERBERT [US], et al) [A] 1,2,7* column W *; | [A]US5826168 (INOUE HAJIME [JP], et al) [A] 1,2,7 * column W *; | [A]EP0892554 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,2,7 * column 7, line 43 - column 8, line 17 * * column 69, line 46 - column 70, line 5 * |