EP1033459 - Lock with reversible latch bolt [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.01.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Karl Fliether GmbH & Co. KG Nevigeser Strasse 22 42551 Velbert / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/34] | For all designated states KARL FLIETHER GmbH & Co. KG Nevigeser Strasse 22 42551 Velbert / DE | ||
Former [2000/36] | For all designated states Karl Fliether GmbH & Co. Nevigeser Strasse 22 D-42551 Velbert / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brand, Horst Kirchstrasse 18 42553 Velbert / DE | [2000/36] | Representative(s) | Grundmann, Dirk, et al Rieder & Partner mbB Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwalt Yale-Allee 26 42329 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/36] | Grundmann, Dirk, Dr., et al Corneliusstrasse 45 42329 Wuppertal / DE | Application number, filing date | 00100892.9 | 18.01.2000 | [2000/36] | Priority number, date | DE19992003743U | 03.03.1999 Original published format: DE 29903743 U | DE19992005748U | 29.03.1999 Original published format: DE 29905748 U | [2000/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1033459 | Date: | 06.09.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1033459 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | [2003/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1033459 | Date: | 09.03.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | E05B63/04 | [2000/36] | CPC: |
E05B63/044 (EP);
E05C9/023 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/36] | Title | German: | Schloss mit umwendbarer Falle | [2000/36] | English: | Lock with reversible latch bolt | [2000/36] | French: | Serrure avec pêne réversible | [2004/29] |
Former [2000/36] | Serreure avec pêne réversible | Examination procedure | 07.05.2003 | Examination requested [2003/28] | 09.06.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 09.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.12.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 09.03.2005 | FI | 09.03.2005 | GR | 09.06.2005 | SE | 09.06.2005 | PT | 07.09.2005 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/07] | FI | 09.03.2005 | |
GR | 09.06.2005 | ||
SE | 09.06.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 09.03.2005 | |
GR | 09.06.2005 | ||
PT | 07.09.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 09.03.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1543834 (MECO NV) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]CH685885 (DOBLER JAKOB [CH]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [DA]EP0735220 (FLIETHER KARL GMBH & CO [DE]) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0894921 (VACHETTE SA [FR]) [A] 1 * the whole document * |