EP1026317 - Calender [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.08.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.09.2009 [2009/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Voith Paper Patent GmbH Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [2000/50] |
Former [2000/32] | For all designated states Voith Sulzer Papiertechnik Patent GmbH Sankt Pöltener Strasse 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gwosdz-Kaupmann, Michael Josefstrasse 1 47839 Krefeld / DE | 02 /
Wenzel, reinhard Glindholzstrasse 19 47809 Krefeld / DE | 03 /
Hermsen, Thomas Im Huck 14 47661 Issum / DE | 04 /
Kayser, Franz Utrechter Strasse 8 47608 Geldern / DE | [2000/32] | Representative(s) | Knoblauch, Andreas, et al Patentanwälte Dr. Knoblauch PartGmbB Reuterweg 51-53 60323 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Knoblauch, Andreas, et al Patentanwälte Dr. Knoblauch Schlosserstrasse 23 60322 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [2000/32] | Knoblauch, Andreas, Dr.-Ing., et al Schlosserstrasse 23 60322 Frankfurt/Main 1 / DE | Application number, filing date | 00100897.8 | 18.01.2000 | [2000/32] | Priority number, date | DE1999104180 | 03.02.1999 Original published format: DE 19904180 | [2000/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1026317 | Date: | 09.08.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1026317 | Date: | 16.05.2001 | [2001/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1026317 | Date: | 01.10.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | D21G1/00 | [2000/32] | CPC: |
D21G1/0086 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB [2002/07] |
Former [2000/32] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Kalander | [2000/32] | English: | Calender | [2000/32] | French: | Calandre | [2000/32] | Examination procedure | 18.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/25] | 02.04.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 16.07.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE36474 (RICHARD SMITH) [A] 1,5,9,10 * the whole document *; | [A]US2755711 (AUGUSTUS MOORE LAWRENCE) [A] 1,5,6,9,10 * column W *; | [A]DE3838746 (ESCHER WYSS GMBH [DE]) |