EP1024296 - Impeller [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.05.2004 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/02] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/31] | For all designated states Mannesmann VDO Aktiengesellschaft Kruppstrasse 105 60388 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Staab, Matthias Eisfeldstrasse 27 36211 Alheim / DE | 02 /
Reinhardt, Rolf Am Wäldchen 4 e 36199 Rotenburg / DE | [2000/31] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2002/20] |
Former [2002/10] | Berg, Peter Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/31] | Klein, Thomas, Dipl.-Ing. Kruppstrasse 105 60388 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 00101122.0 | 21.01.2000 | [2000/31] | Priority number, date | DE1999103397 | 29.01.1999 Original published format: DE 19903397 | [2000/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1024296 | Date: | 02.08.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1024296 | Date: | 15.11.2000 | [2000/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1024296 | Date: | 23.07.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F04D29/18 | [2000/31] | CPC: |
F04D29/188 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/31] |
Former [2000/31] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Laufrad | [2000/31] | English: | Impeller | [2000/31] | French: | Rotor | [2002/49] |
Former [2000/31] | Rouet | Examination procedure | 12.10.2000 | Examination requested [2000/51] | 05.02.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 09.07.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.11.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 17.03.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2911189 (VON OHAIN HANS J PABST) [Y] 1 * column 2, line 24 * * column 2, line 60 - line 64; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE1428246 (SIEMENS AG) [A] 1* figure . *; | [Y]DE19716086 (MANNESMANN VDO AG [DE]) [Y] 1 * column 1, line 3 - line 6 * * column 2, line 57 - line 60; figure - * |