EP1028489 - Connecting terminal device for wire and busbar flat conductors for an electrical apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.12.2002 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.12.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.02.2003 [2003/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB PATENT GmbH Kallstadter Strasse 1 68309 Mannheim / DE | [2000/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eppe, Klaus-Peter, Dipl.-Ing. Theodor-Leutwein-Strasse 6 69429 Waldbrunn / DE | 02 /
Schmitt, Volker Ringstrasse 41 69245 Bammental / DE | 03 /
Goehle, Rolf, Dipl.-Ing. Im Bubenwingert 16 69181 Leimen / DE | [2000/33] | Representative(s) | Miller, Toivo, et al ABB Patent GmbH Postfach 1140 68520 Ladenburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/33] | Miller, Toivo, et al ABB Patent GmbH Postfach 10 03 51 68128 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 00101255.8 | 25.01.2000 | [2000/33] | Priority number, date | DE1999105442 | 10.02.1999 Original published format: DE 19905442 | [2000/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1028489 | Date: | 16.08.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H01R4/36 | [2000/33] | CPC: |
H01R4/363 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/33] | Extension states | SI | 09.02.2000 | Title | German: | Anschlussklemmenanordnung für anzuschliessende Draht- und Sammelschienenflachbandleiter für ein elektrisches Gerät | [2000/33] | English: | Connecting terminal device for wire and busbar flat conductors for an electrical apparatus | [2000/33] | French: | Dispositif de bornes de connexion pour des conducteurs à fil et des conducteurs plats de barre omnibus pour un appareillage électrique | [2000/33] | Examination procedure | 18.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/33] | 01.08.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/06] | 06.09.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/06] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2002 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE9102953U (ADELS-CONTACT) [A] 1,3 * page 4, paragraph L - page 5, paragraph L; figures 3,7,8 *; | [A]DE9412680U (WECO WESTER EBBINGHAUS & CO [DE]) [A] 1 * page 4, paragraph L - page 5, paragraph 2; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0893846 (ABB CONTROL SA [FR]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 46 - line 55 * * column 5, line 13 - line 24; figures 3-5 * |