EP1024624 - Method and apparatus for signal receiving synchronization [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.05.2007 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 31.12.2008 [2009/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/28] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2000/31] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nishimura, Osami NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2000/31] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/31] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00101610.4 | 28.01.2000 | [2000/31] | Priority number, date | JP19990022319 | 29.01.1999 Original published format: JP 2231999 | [2000/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1024624 | Date: | 02.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1024624 | Date: | 17.12.2003 | [2003/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1024624 | Date: | 12.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04L7/027, H04L7/04 | [2000/31] | CPC: |
H04L27/0014 (EP,US);
H04L7/042 (EP,US);
H04L2027/0028 (EP,US);
H04L2027/0055 (EP,US);
H04L2027/0093 (EP,US);
H04L7/007 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/37] |
Former [2000/31] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Synchronisierung empfangener Signale | [2000/31] | English: | Method and apparatus for signal receiving synchronization | [2000/31] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de synchronisation de signaux recus | [2000/31] | Examination procedure | 06.11.2003 | Examination requested [2004/02] | 09.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.04.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 07.04.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.04.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 12.07.2006 | GB | 28.01.2007 | [2009/01] |
Former [2007/51] | GB | 28.01.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]EP0809377 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]) [XD] 1,4,7,11 * abstract * * figures 1-5 * * page 2, columns 19-21 * * page 2, line 38 - page 3, line 28 * * page 3, line 35 - page 4, line 4 * * page 5, line 12 - page 5, line 38 *; | [A]EP0767557 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * figures 1-4 * * page 2, line 40 - page 2, line 51 * * page 3, line 5 - page 4, line 25 * * page 4, line 43 - page 4, line 47 * * page 5, line 22 - page 5, line 27 *; | [A]US5428647 (RASKY PHILLIP D [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * abstract * * figures 1-5 * * column 2, line 55 - column 2, line 67 * * column 5, line 10 - column 5, line 41 * * column 8, line 30 - column 9, line 15 * |