EP1032102 - Distributor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.03.2004 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 21.02.2007 [2007/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUANTE AG Uellendahler Strasse 353 42109 Wuppertal / DE | [2000/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Denter, Friedrich Wilhelm Mittelstrasse 27 44575 Castrop-Rauxel / DE | 02 /
Schlüter, Dieter Buerboomweg 76 46284 Dorsten / DE | [2000/35] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/35] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00101650.0 | 01.02.2000 | [2000/35] | Priority number, date | DE1999203518U | 26.02.1999 Original published format: DE 29903518 U | [2000/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1032102 | Date: | 30.08.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1032102 | Date: | 29.11.2000 | [2000/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1032102 | Date: | 07.05.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H02G3/04, H04Q1/14, H02G3/08 | [2000/48] | CPC: |
H02G3/0487 (EP);
H04Q1/149 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2000/35] | H02G3/04, H04Q1/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/35] | Extension states | RO | 25.01.2001 | Title | German: | Verteilereinrichtung | [2000/35] | English: | Distributor | [2000/35] | French: | Dispositif de distribution | [2000/35] | Examination procedure | 25.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/13] | 22.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.04.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.2002 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.07.2002 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 14.11.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 14.11.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP02023618.8 / EP1276196 | Opposition(s) | 10.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 07.05.2003 | DK | 07.08.2003 | GR | 07.08.2003 | AT | 01.02.2004 | FI | 01.02.2004 | LU | 01.02.2004 | IE | 02.02.2004 | [2007/08] |
Former [2005/36] | DK | 07.08.2003 | |
GR | 07.08.2003 | ||
AT | 01.02.2004 | ||
FI | 01.02.2004 | ||
LU | 01.02.2004 | ||
IE | 02.02.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | DK | 07.08.2003 | |
GR | 07.08.2003 | ||
FI | 01.02.2004 | ||
LU | 01.02.2004 | ||
IE | 02.02.2004 | ||
Former [2005/19] | DK | 07.08.2003 | |
GR | 07.08.2003 | ||
FI | 01.02.2004 | ||
IE | 02.02.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | DK | 07.08.2003 | |
GR | 07.08.2003 | ||
FI | 01.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/23] | DK | 07.08.2003 | |
GR | 07.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | GR | 07.08.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2901766 (TELEFONBAU & NORMALZEIT GMBH) [A] 1-3,8* page 8, line 12 - page 8, line 21; figure 1 *; | [A]US4581489 (NOZICK JACQUES [FR]) [A] 1-3,6 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0204675 (ADC TELECOMMUNICATIONS INC [US]) [A] 1-3,6 * page 6, line 18 - page 7, line 4; figure 3 *; | [DA]EP0647072 (QUANTE AG [DE]) [DA] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]DE19537529 (KRONE AG [DE]) [A] 1,2 * the whole document * |