EP1038736 - Head protecting air bag system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.06.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYODA GOSEI CO., LTD. 1, Nagahata, Ochiai, Haruhi-cho Nishikasugai-gun Aichi-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/39] | For all designated states TOYODA GOSEI CO., LTD. 1, Nagahata, Ochiai, Haruhi-cho Nishikasugai-gun Aichi-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Totani, Chiharu 2-2, Ebisu-cho 3-chome Gifu-shi, Gifu-ken / JP | 02 /
Kobayashi, Fumitake 12, Aza-Nakatajima, Hanaigata, Hagiwara-cho Ichinomiya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 03 /
Nagai, Yutaka 5039-5, Denpoji, Hachimankita, Tanyo-cho Ichinomiya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 04 /
Tajima, Hiroyuki 43-18, Chano, Shinbayashi-cho Chiryu-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 05 /
Osawa, Yasuyuki 13-6, Haruoka 1-chome, Chikusa-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | [2000/39] | Representative(s) | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2009/48] |
Former [2000/39] | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00101795.3 | 28.01.2000 | [2000/39] | Priority number, date | JP19990081421 | 25.03.1999 Original published format: JP 8142199 | JP19990150449 | 28.05.1999 Original published format: JP 15044999 | JP19990150488 | 28.05.1999 Original published format: JP 15048899 | [2000/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1038736 | Date: | 27.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1038736 | Date: | 05.09.2001 | [2001/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1038736 | Date: | 18.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/16, B60R21/20 | [2001/35] | CPC: |
B60R21/213 (EP);
B60R21/215 (EP);
B60R21/2165 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2000/39] | B60R21/16 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2002/21] |
Former [2000/39] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Kopfschützendes Airbagsystem | [2000/39] | English: | Head protecting air bag system | [2000/39] | French: | Système de protection de la tête par coussin gonflable | [2000/39] | Examination procedure | 28.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/39] | 23.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0878363 (TOYODA GOSEI KK [JP], et al) [X] 1-13 * column 9, line 12 - line 33 * * column 10, line 15 - line 22 * * column 20, line 38 - line 44 * * column 22, line 10 - line 18; figures 2,36 * * abstract *; | [X]US5884937 (YAMADA SHUJI [JP]) [X] 1-13 * column 3, line 7 - line 18 * * column 4, line 41 - line 58; figure 7 * * abstract *; | [A]EP0855315 (HS TECH & DESIGN [DE]) [A] 1-13 * abstract *; | [A]US5863068 (BREED DAVID S [US]) [A] 1-13 * abstract *; | [A]EP0900704 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-13 * abstract * |