EP1024084 - Improvements in machines for mounting valve bags [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.05.2003 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.05.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.07.2003 [2003/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ventomatic A/S Vigerslev Allé 77 2500 Valby / DK | [2000/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brioschi, Sergio 2F, Via Verdi 20050 Sulbiate (Milano) / IT | [2000/31] | Representative(s) | Luksch, Giorgio, et al Giambrocono & C. s.p.a., Via Rosolino Pilo, 19/b 20129 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2000/31] | Luksch, Giorgio, Dr.-Ing., et al Ing. A. Giambrocono & C. S.r.l. Via Rosolino Pilo, 19/b 20129 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 00101802.7 | 28.01.2000 | [2000/31] | Priority number, date | IT1999BG00004 | 29.01.1999 Original published format: IT BG990004 | [2000/31] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1024084 | Date: | 02.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B65B43/26 | [2000/31] | CPC: |
B65B43/262 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2001/16] |
Former [2000/31] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verbesserungen an Ventilbeutel-Aufrichtmaschinen | [2000/31] | English: | Improvements in machines for mounting valve bags | [2000/31] | French: | Améliorations pour machines de montage de sacs à valve | [2000/31] | Examination procedure | 22.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/18] | 05.02.2001 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 08.06.2001 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 23.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/27] | 15.01.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 16.03.2001 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2001 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2001 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2001 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2001 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2001 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2001 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2001 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2001 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2001 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2001 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2001 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2001 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2002 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.03.2002 | 31.01.2003 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4664162 (DURANT WILL G [US]) [A] 1 * column A * * column 4, line 56 - column 6, line 28; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE4229963 (HAVER & BOECKER [DE]) [A] 1,2 * column 3, line 31 - column 4, line 41; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US3715858 (DURANT W, et al) [A] 1 * column A * * column 2, line 17 - line 62 * * column 6, line 1 - column 7, line 24; figures 1-4 * |