|
10.12.2010 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.12.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.12.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.12.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.11.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.11.2010 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
15 |
|
02.11.2010 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
8 |
|
27.10.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.10.2010 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
01.10.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.09.2010 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.09.2010 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.09.2010 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.09.2010 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
27.09.2010 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.09.2010 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.09.2010 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.09.2010 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
16.09.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.09.2010 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.07.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.07.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.07.2010 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
9 |
|
22.07.2010 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.02.2009 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.02.2009 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.01.2009 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.12.2008 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
9 |
|
24.12.2008 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
9 |
|
20.11.2008 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.10.2008 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.10.2008 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.10.2008 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
01.09.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.08.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.08.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.08.2008 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
17 |
|
27.08.2008 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
27.08.2008 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.08.2008 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
27.08.2008 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.08.2008 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.08.2008 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.08.2008 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.08.2008 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.08.2008 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.08.2008 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.08.2008 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
11 |
|
30.07.2008 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.07.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.07.2008 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
9 |
|
01.07.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
8 |
|
30.06.2008 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
4 |
|
30.06.2008 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
5 |
|
30.06.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
8 |
|
16.05.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.05.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.05.2008 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.03.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.03.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.03.2008 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.03.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.03.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.03.2008 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.09.2004 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.09.2004 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.09.2004 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.07.2004 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.07.2004 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.01.2004 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.12.2003 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
13 |
|
13.12.2003 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.12.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
12.12.2003 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
17 |
|
24.07.2003 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.04.2003 |
Approval of request for amendments/corrections |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.04.2003 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2003 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.2003 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.2003 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.03.2003 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.02.2003 |
Notice concerning a request for amendments/corrections |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.02.2003 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.2003 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.2003 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.01.2003 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
28.10.2002 |
Final instructions (loss of partial rights) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.2002 |
Designation deemed to be withdrawn (non payment of designation fees) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.2002 |
Communication concerning non paid of designation fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.09.2001 |
Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2001 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.06.2001 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.08.2000 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.08.2000 |
Request concerning the applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.07.2000 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.07.2000 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.07.2000 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.06.2000 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.03.2000 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.03.2000 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.02.2000 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.02.2000 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.02.2000 |
Description |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
04.02.2000 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.02.2000 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.02.2000 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
31.01.2000 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.01.2000 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
31.01.2000 |
Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language |
Search / examination |
14 |