EP1048743 - Creep-resistant magnesium alloy die castings [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.02.2005 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION 3044 West Grand Boulevard Detroit Michigan 48202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/44] | For all designated states GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION 3044 West Grand Boulevard Detroit Michigan 48202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Powell, Bob R. 1509 Birmingham Boulevard Birmingham, Michigan 48009 / US | 02 /
Rezhets, Vadim 1440 Rossdale Waterford, Michigan 48328 / US | 03 /
Luo, Aihua A. 278 Woodside Court Rochester Hills, Michigan 48307 / US | 04 /
Tiwari, Basant L. 3464 Dobbin Drive Sterling Heights, Michigan 48310 / US | [2000/44] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/44] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner Postfach 22 16 11 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00101903.3 | 31.01.2000 | [2000/44] | Priority number, date | US19990302529 | 30.04.1999 Original published format: US 302529 | [2000/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1048743 | Date: | 02.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1048743 | Date: | 14.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C22C23/02 | [2000/44] | CPC: |
C22C23/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/29] |
Former [2000/44] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Druckgiessteile aus einer kriechbeständigen Magnesiumlegierung | [2000/44] | English: | Creep-resistant magnesium alloy die castings | [2000/44] | French: | Pièces coulées en alliage de magnesium, résistantes au fluage | [2000/44] | Examination procedure | 06.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/17] | 31.08.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.01.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.01.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0799901 (MAZDA MOTOR [JP]) [X] 1-15 * page 4, line 12 - line 13; examples 5-7; claims 1,3 * * page 3, line 25 - line 28 *; | [X]JPH08269609 ; | [X]JPH0625790 ; | [A]JPH0841576 ; | [A]US5147603 (NUSSBAUM GILLES [FR], et al) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970228), vol. 1997, no. 02, & JP08269609 A 19961015 (TOYOTA CENTRAL RES &DEV LAB INC) [X] 1,10,13 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1994, no. 09, Database accession no. 1994-072288, XP002143487 & JPH0625790 A 19940201 (METALLGESELLSCHAFT AG) [X] 1,10,13 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960628), vol. 1996, no. 06, & JP08041576 A 19960213 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] * abstract * |