EP1121959 - Emergency flight safety device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.11.2002 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OPTREL AG Industriestrasse 2 9630 Wattwil / CH | [2001/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Keller, Leo Breitlstrasse 58 8614 Bertschikon / CH | [2001/32] | Representative(s) | Frei, Alexandra Sarah Frei Patentanwaltsbüro Postfach 1771 8032 Zürich / CH | [2009/49] |
Former [2001/32] | Frei, Alexandra Sarah Frei Patentanwaltsbüro Postfach 768 8029 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 00101939.7 | 01.02.2000 | [2001/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1121959 | Date: | 08.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A62B18/08, A62B9/00, G02B27/01 | [2001/32] | CPC: |
G02B27/017 (EP,US);
A62B18/08 (EP,US);
A62B9/006 (EP,US);
B64D25/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2002/18] |
Former [2001/32] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Flugsicherheitsgerät für einen Notfall | [2001/32] | English: | Emergency flight safety device | [2001/32] | French: | Dispositif de sûreté d'urgence pour aéronef | [2001/32] | Examination procedure | 09.02.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/51] | 16.07.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2002/51] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 22.04.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 22.04.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.04.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 22.04.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 22.04.2002 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.04.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 22.04.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 22.04.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 22.04.2002 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 22.04.2002 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 22.04.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 22.04.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 22.04.2002 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 22.04.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 22.04.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 22.04.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 22.04.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 22.04.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 22.04.2002 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2002 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]EP0301997 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [X] 1-3,5-7 * abstract * * column 5, line 39 - line 49 * * figure 5 * [A] 8-12 [Y] 4; | [Y]JPH08317318 ; | [XAY]US5601078 (SCHALLER UWE [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6 * abstract * * column 2, line 16 - line 30 * * column 3, line 22 - line 28 * * figure 2 * [A] 3,7,12 [Y] 8-11; | [YA]US4741332 (BEAUSSANT RAYMOND [FR]) [Y] 8-11 * abstract * * column 1, line 11 - line 14 * * column 1, line 61 - column 2, line 17 * * figure 1 * [A] 1-7,12; | [XA]EP0252281 (DRAEGERWERK AG [DE]) [X] 1,2 * the whole document * * figure 1 * [A] 3-12 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970331), vol. 1997, no. 03, & JP08317318 A 19961129 (GALAXY:KK) [Y] 4 * abstract * | by applicant | US5115804 |