EP1067197 - Production of chitosan and chitin [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.05.2006 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Food Industry Research and Development Institute P.O. Box 246 Hsinchu 300 / TW | [2005/21] |
Former [2001/02] | For all designated states Food Industry Research and Development Institute P.O. Box 246 Hsinchu 30099 / TW | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chen, Mei-Huei No. 8, Alley 15, Lane 582, His-Ta Road Hsinchu 300 / TW | 02 /
Chen, Hing-Yuen No. 3, Lane 16, Chung-Hsiao 2nd Road Miaoli 351 / TW | 03 /
Wu, Chih-Lu No.8, Alley 2, Lane 838, Ching-Kuo Road Hsinchu 300 / TW | 04 /
Chuang, Su-Hui 253, Chung-Cheng Road Hsinpu, Hsinchu 305 / TW | 05 /
Hwang, Ing-Er No.32, Lane 56, His-Chou 2nd Road Lin-Yuan, Kaohsiung 832 / TW | 06 /
Chen, Yen-Li 13 Floor, no. 18, Hsin-Fu 2nd Street Ping-Chen, Taoyuan 324 / TW | [2001/02] | Representative(s) | Behnisch, Werner, et al ATTENTION: ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Behnisch, Werner, et al Reinhard-Skuhra-Weise & Partner GbR Patentanwälte Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/02] | Behnisch, Werner, Dr., et al Reinhard-Skuhra-Weise & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 44 01 51 80750 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00102209.4 | 10.02.2000 | [2001/02] | Priority number, date | US19990349807 | 08.07.1999 Original published format: US 349807 | [2001/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1067197 | Date: | 10.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1067197 | Date: | 02.05.2001 | [2001/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1067197 | Date: | 15.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C12P19/26, C12N1/14 | [2001/02] | CPC: |
C12P19/26 (EP,US);
C12N1/14 (EP,US);
Y10S435/911 (EP,US);
Y10S435/939 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [2002/04] |
Former [2001/02] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Herstellung von Chitin und Chitosan | [2001/02] | English: | Production of chitosan and chitin | [2001/02] | French: | Production de chitine et de chitosane | [2001/02] | Examination procedure | 19.09.2001 | Examination requested [2001/46] | 10.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.12.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 10.12.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP04017524.2 / EP1471148 | EP04017525.9 / EP1471149 | Opposition(s) | 16.03.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0813250 ; | [A] - SU C T ET AL, "The chitosan yield of zygomycetes at their optimum harvesting time", CARBOHYDRATE POLYMERS,GB,APPLIED SCIENCE PUBLISHERSLTD. BARKING, (19960801), vol. 30, no. 4, ISSN 0144-8617, pages 239 - 242, XP004062709 [A] 1-5 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0144-8617(96)00052-5 | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1996, no. 12, Database accession no. 1996-113203, XP002151595 & JPH0813250 A 19960116 (AGENCY OF IND SCI & TECHNOLOGY) [A] 1-5 * abstract * |