EP1029568 - Method for displaying a shoot of a character in a video game, storage medium for storing a video game program, and video game device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.01.2012 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.01.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.02.2012 [2012/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Konami Digital Entertainment Co., Ltd. 9-7-2, Akasaka Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2010/09] |
Former [2000/34] | For all designated states Konami Co., Ltd. 3-1, Toranomon 4-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sato, Masahiro Room No. 302, San-ei Haitsu, 5-16-8, Matsue Edogawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2000/34] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/34] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00102282.1 | 17.02.2000 | [2000/34] | Priority number, date | JP19990042406 | 19.02.1999 Original published format: JP 4240699 | [2000/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1029568 | Date: | 23.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1029568 | Date: | 07.04.2004 | [2004/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A63F13/10 | [2000/34] | CPC: |
A63F13/24 (EP);
A63F13/812 (EP,US);
A63F13/44 (EP);
A63F13/46 (EP,US);
A63F13/533 (EP);
A63F2300/1043 (EP);
A63F2300/308 (EP);
A63F2300/61 (EP);
A63F2300/638 (EP,US);
A63F2300/8011 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/01] |
Former [2000/34] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Darstellung des Wurfs eines Charakters in einem Videospiel, Aufzeichnungsmedium zum Aufzeichnen eines Videospiels und Videospielvorrichtung | [2000/34] | English: | Method for displaying a shoot of a character in a video game, storage medium for storing a video game program, and video game device | [2000/34] | French: | Méthode de représentation d'une lancée par un charactère dans un jeu vidéo | [2000/34] | Examination procedure | 23.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/35] | 29.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/09] | 10.10.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/09] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.08.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2011 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5411271 (MIRANDO SALVATORE [US]) [Y] 1,2,5,12,13,16,22,23,26 * column 1, line 55 - line 60 * * column 1, line 64 - column 2, line 11 *; | [Y]WO9732642 (NAMCO LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 1,2,5,12,13,16,22,23,26; | [A]WO9847588 (SEGA ENTERPRISES KK [JP], et al) [A] 1,12,22; | EP0913174 [ ] (SEGA ENTERPRISES KK [JP]) [ ] * paragraph [0087] - paragraph [0088] *; | US6149523 [ ] (YAMADA MASANORI [JP], et al) [ ] * column 4, line 33 - line 53 * * column 4, line 62 - column 5, line 26 * * column 5, line 52 - line 55 * * column 7, line 4 - line 43 * |