EP1030140 - Tray of adjustable capacity for refrigerator doors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.06.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.06.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.07.2004 [2004/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WHIRLPOOL CORPORATION 2000 M-63 Benton Harbor Michigan 49022 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/34] | For all designated states WHIRLPOOL CORPORATION 2000 M-63 Benton Harbor Michigan 49022 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brambilla, Enrico, c/o Whirlpool Europe s.r.l. Patent Dept., V. Le G. Borghi, 27 21025 Comerio / IT | 02 /
Gadaleta Caldalora, Vincenzo c/o Whirlpool Europe s.r.l., Patent Dept. V. Le G. Borghi, 27, 21025 Comerio / IT | [2000/34] | Representative(s) | Guerci, Alessandro Whirlpool EMEA S.p.A. Patent Department Viale G. Borghi 27 21025 Comerio (VA) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2000/34] | Guerci, Alessandro Whirlpool Europe S.r.l. Patent Department Viale G. Borghi 27 21025 Comerio (VA) / IT | Application number, filing date | 00102327.4 | 03.02.2000 | [2000/34] | Priority number, date | IT1999MI00089U | 17.02.1999 Original published format: IT MI990089 U | [2000/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1030140 | Date: | 23.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1030140 | Date: | 11.07.2001 | [2001/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F25D23/04, A47B57/00 | [2000/34] | CPC: |
A47B57/58 (EP);
F25D23/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2002/14] |
Former [2000/34] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Abstellplatte mit einstellbarer Kapazität für Kühlschranktüren | [2000/34] | English: | Tray of adjustable capacity for refrigerator doors | [2000/34] | French: | Plaque de support à capacité ajustable pour portes de réfrigérateur | [2000/34] | Examination procedure | 17.12.2001 | Examination requested [2002/08] | 09.09.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/30] | 23.02.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2004/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2004 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]JPH10122733 ; | [A]JPH10115485 ; | [A]DE4304502 (BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [A] 1-4 * column 3, line 13 - column 5, line 30 * * claim 1 * * figures 1-6 *; | [A]US2705565 (RALPH MCKIRGAN) [A] 1 * column 1, line 35 - column 1, line 45 * * column 2, line 52 - column 3, line 7 * * column 3, line 25 - column 3, line 39 * * figures 2-4 *; | [A]EP0452977 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [A] 1 * figures 1,5,6,8,11 * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980831), vol. 1998, no. 10, & JP10122733 A 19980515 (FUJITSU GENERAL LTD) [DA] 1-4 * abstract * * figures 1-10 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980831), vol. 1998, no. 10, & JP10115485 A 19980506 (FUJITSU GENERAL LTD) [A] 1-4 * abstract * * figures 1-6 * |