EP1028042 - Headlight cleaning device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.10.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/02] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/33] | For all designated states Mannesmann VDO Aktiengesellschaft Kruppstrasse 105 60388 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Petzold, Sven Nietzschestrasse 36 65191 Wiesbaden / DE | 02 /
Bandemer, Joachim Castellring 10 61130 Nidderau / DE | [2000/33] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2002/20] |
Former [2000/33] | Klein, Thomas, Dipl.-Ing. Kruppstrasse 105 60388 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 00102361.3 | 03.07.1997 | [2000/33] | Priority number, date | DE1996130421 | 27.07.1996 Original published format: DE 19630421 | [2000/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1028042 | Date: | 16.08.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1028042 | Date: | 22.12.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B60S1/52, B60S1/60, B60S1/48 | [2000/33] | CPC: |
B60S1/488 (EP);
B60S1/528 (EP);
B60S1/603 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [2000/33] | Title | German: | Scheinwerfer-Reinigungseinrichtung | [2000/33] | English: | Headlight cleaning device | [2000/33] | French: | Dispositif de nettoyage pour projecteur | [2000/33] | Examination procedure | 12.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/33] | 21.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.03.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.05.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP97111090.3 / EP0820911 | Opposition(s) | 23.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]GB2026851 (SMITHS INDUSTRIES LTD) [X] 1-3 * figures 1-3 * * page 1, line 124 - page 2, line 99 * * page 4, column EP056647, lines 5-24 * [Y] 4-6; | [Y]FR2673154 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 4-6 * page 9, line 33 - page 10, line 15 * * page 14, lines 12-21; figures 1,2 *; | [PX]FR2738166 (VALEO SYSTEMES DESSUYAGE [FR]) [PX] 1,2 * abstract * * page 4, line 16 - page 5, line 4 * | by applicant | DE2455294 |