EP1018344 - HLA-restricted hepatitis B virus CTL epitopes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.01.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.01.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.03.2006 [2006/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Epimmune Inc. 5820 Nancy Ridge Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2002/01] |
Former [2000/28] | For all designated states Epimmune, Inc. 6555 Nancy Ridge Drive, Suite 200 San Diego, California 92121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vitiello, Maria A. 7522 High Avenue La Jolla, CA 92037 / US | 02 /
Chesnut, Robert W. 1473 Kings Cross Drive Cardiff by the Sea, CA 92007 / US | [2000/28] | Representative(s) | Cripps, Joanna Elizabeth, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/28] | Cripps, Joanna Elizabeth, et al Mewburn Ellis York House 23 Kingsway GB-London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 00102538.6 | 26.08.1992 | [2000/28] | Priority number, date | US19910749568 | 26.08.1991 Original published format: US 749568 | US19920827682 | 29.01.1992 Original published format: US 827682 | US19920874491 | 27.04.1992 Original published format: US 874491 | [2000/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1018344 | Date: | 12.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1018344 | Date: | 20.09.2000 | [2000/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/51, A61K39/29, G01N33/569, C07K7/00 | [2000/35] | CPC: |
C07K14/005 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/20 (EP);
A61K2039/57 (EP);
A61K39/00 (EP,US);
C07K2319/00 (EP);
C12N2730/10122 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2000/28] | A61K39/29, A61K47/48, C07K14/02, C07K19/00, C07K14/33, A61K39/08, G01N33/68 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/28] | Title | German: | HLA-reduzierte CTL-Epitope gegen Hepatite B-Virus | [2000/28] | English: | HLA-restricted hepatitis B virus CTL epitopes | [2000/28] | French: | Epitopes du virus de l'hépatite B induisant une réponse CTL rétrécie par HLA | [2000/28] | Examination procedure | 23.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/28] | 21.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.08.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/11] | 23.09.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/11] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP92307764.8 / EP0534615 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 06.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 21.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 02.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 01.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2004 | 13   M06   Fee paid on   02.09.2004 | 31.08.2005 | 14   M06   Fee paid on   01.09.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0271302 (SCRIPPS CLINIC RES [US]); | [X]EP0433242 (CESALPINO ANDREA FOND [IT]); | [X]WO9109869 (MEDICAL RES COUNCIL [GB], et al); |