EP1025836 - Cosmetic light screening composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.02.2004 Database last updated on 23.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.02.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.03.2004 [2004/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG 4070 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2000/32] | For all designated states F. HOFFMANN-LA ROCHE AG 4070 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bringhen, Alain 124 Rte de Choulex 1244 Choulex / CH | 02 /
Gonzenbach, Hans Ulrich 2 rue Liotard 1202 Genève / CH | 03 /
Schwarzenbach, Rolf Köhlbergstrasse 1 8405 Winterthur / CH | 04 /
Sidrac, Dominique Contamines Etoiles, 5 avenue Louis Armand 74160 Saint-Julien (en Genevois) / FR | [2000/32] | Representative(s) | Keller, Günter, et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Unsöldstrasse 2 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/18] | Keller, Günter, Dr., et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 16 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/32] | Kellenberger, Marcus Dr., et al F.Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 00102539.4 | 07.02.2000 | [2000/32] | Priority number, date | EP19990102456 | 08.02.1999 Original published format: EP 99102456 | [2000/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1025836 | Date: | 09.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/42, C07C229/30 | [2000/32] | CPC: |
A61K8/892 (EP);
A61K8/27 (EP);
A61K8/29 (EP);
A61K8/35 (EP);
A61K8/37 (EP);
A61K8/40 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/32] | Title | German: | Kosmetiches Lichtschutzmittel | [2000/32] | English: | Cosmetic light screening composition | [2000/32] | French: | Composition de protection solaire | [2000/32] | Examination procedure | 09.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/15] | 05.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.09.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/13] | 20.10.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CA2244556 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [X] 1-3,5,6,9,10,12,13,15 * claims 1-11 *; | [D]EP0895776 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]); | [A]US3079366 (BOYLE RICHARD J, et al) [A] * table 4 * |