EP0999117 - Vehicle with brake and steering system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.11.2006 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.12.2006 [2006/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler AG Epplestrasse 225 70567 Stuttgart / DE | [2000/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thurner, Thomas Zum Trösterbrünnel 11 73230 Kirchheim / DE | 02 /
Vogel, Thomas, Prof. Dr. Salzburger Strasse 3 71229 Leonberg / DE | [2000/19] | Application number, filing date | 00102607.9 | 13.06.1996 | [2000/19] | Priority number, date | DE1995126250 | 18.07.1995 Original published format: DE 19526250 | [2000/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0999117 | Date: | 10.05.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0999117 | Date: | 04.12.2002 | [2002/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B62D6/00, B62D7/14, B60T8/00, B62D5/30, B60T17/18, B62D6/04, B62D7/09, B60K28/10 | [2002/47] | CPC: |
B60G17/0195 (EP,US);
B60T17/18 (EP,US);
B60T8/00 (EP,KR,US);
B60T8/1755 (EP,US);
B60T8/321 (EP,US);
B60T8/885 (EP,US);
B62D5/003 (EP,US);
B62D6/002 (EP,US);
B62D7/159 (EP,US);
B62D9/005 (EP,US);
B60T2260/02 (EP,US);
B60T2270/402 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2000/19] | B62D6/00, B62D7/14, B60T8/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [2000/19] | Title | German: | Fahrzeug mit Brems- und Lenksystem | [2000/19] | English: | Vehicle with brake and steering system | [2000/19] | French: | Véhicule avec système de freinage et de direction | [2000/19] | Examination procedure | 03.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/32] | 13.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.08.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/52] | 20.07.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/52] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP96109477.8 / EP0754611 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2006 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE4123232 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [X] 1,4,7,8,17-19 * page 2, line 9 - line 17 * [Y] 2,3,5,6,9-12,22-24; | [Y]GB2205009 (LUCAS IND PLC) [Y] 11,12 * abstract * | [Y] - J. MILLWARD, "Electronic system architecture", AUTOMOTIVE ENGINEERING, Brimfeld, OH, USA, (199304), vol. 101, no. 4, ISSN 0098-2571, pages 15 - 17, XP002214579 [Y] 2,22-24 * page 17, column R, paragraph 2 - paragraph 4 * | [Y] - G. MASTINU ET AL, "Integrated Controls of Lateral Vehicle Dynamics", PROCEEDINGS OF 13TH IAVSD SYMPOSIUM, Chengdu, China, (199308), vol. 23, ISSN 0042-3114, ISBN 90 265 1380 1, XP002214580 [Y] 3,5,6,9,10 * the whole document * |