EP1123657 - A process to preserve green colour in frozen vegetables [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.09.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 16.05.2007 [2007/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE DES PRODUITS NESTLE S.A. Case postale 353 1800 Vevey / CH | [2001/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sundara, Venkata-Ramana Ch. du Ravin 24 1012 Lausanne / CH | 02 /
Berberat, Alexis 2, rue du Léman 1814 La Tour-de-Peilz / CH | [2001/33] | Representative(s) | Thomas, Alain, et al 55, avenue Nestlé 1800 Vevey / CH | [2001/33] | Application number, filing date | 00102667.3 | 09.02.2000 | [2001/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1123657 | Date: | 16.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1123657 | Date: | 17.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A23B7/06, A23L1/272, A23B7/05, A23B7/08, A23B7/157 | [2001/33] | CPC: |
A23B7/05 (EP);
A23B7/06 (EP);
A23B7/08 (EP);
A23B7/157 (EP);
A23L5/41 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/33] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Aufrechterhaltung der grünen Farbe von gefrorenen Gemüsen | [2001/33] | English: | A process to preserve green colour in frozen vegetables | [2001/33] | French: | Procédé pour conserver la couleur verte des légumes surgelés | [2001/33] | Examination procedure | 18.02.2002 | Examination requested [2002/17] | 13.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.08.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 23.08.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 09.02.2005 | MC | 28.02.2005 | [2007/20] |
Former [2006/14] | MC | 28.02.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2189774 (BLAIR JAMES S) [A] 1-7 * page 1, column L, line 1 - line 11 * * page 2, column L, line 55 - page 3, column R, line 68 *; | [A]GB772062 (MALECKI GEORGE JERZY) [A] 1 * claim - *; | [A]US4473591 (SEGNER WAYNE P [US], et al); | [A]US4701330 (ROGERS ANN M [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * column 2, line 3 - column 3, line 35; table . *; | [A]US5397584 (AUNG THEIN [US], et al) [A] 1-3,7 * example -; claim - *; | [A]US5942270 (OGANESOFF VERONIQUE [FR], et al) [A] 1-7 * example -; claim - * |