EP1018724 - Computerized music apparatus processing waveform to create sound effect [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.04.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.06.2005 [2005/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states YAMAHA CORPORATION 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka-ken 430 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/28] | For all designated states YAMAHA CORPORATION 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka-ken 430 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mukaino, Hirofumi Yamaha Corporation, 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka-ken, 430 / JP | 02 /
Mori, Takeshi Yamaha Corporation, 10-1, Nakazawa-cho Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka-ken, 430 / JP | [2000/28] | Representative(s) | Kehl, Günther Kehl, Ascherl, Liebhoff & Ettmayr Patentanwälte Friedrich-Herschel-Strasse 9 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/28] | Kehl, Günther, Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwaltskanzlei Günther Kehl Friedrich-Herschel-Strasse 9 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00102932.1 | 19.09.1996 | [2000/28] | Priority number, date | JP19950266252 | 20.09.1995 Original published format: JP 26625295 | JP19950266253 | 20.09.1995 Original published format: JP 26625395 | [2000/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1018724 | Date: | 12.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1018724 | Date: | 09.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G10H1/02, G10H7/00, G10H7/02, G10H1/00 | [2000/28] | CPC: |
G10H7/006 (EP,US);
G10H7/00 (KR);
G10H1/0091 (EP,US);
G10H1/02 (EP,US);
G10H7/002 (EP,US);
G10H7/02 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [2000/28] | Title | German: | Digitales Musikinstrument mit Wellenformbearbeitung zur Erzeugung eines Klangeffektes | [2000/28] | English: | Computerized music apparatus processing waveform to create sound effect | [2000/28] | French: | Instrument de musique numérique avec traitement de forme d'onde pour générer un effet sonore | [2000/28] | Examination procedure | 14.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/28] | 12.12.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 08.04.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP96115054.7 / EP0764934 | Opposition(s) | 10.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5350882 (KOGUCHI SATORU [JP], et al) [A] 1,2,5,6,8,9 * column 19, line 52 - column 20, line 53 ** column 22, line 5 - column 23, line 10; figures 16,17 * |