EP1032133 - Phase locked loop with low phase error [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.11.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.01.2003 [2003/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/35] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Trimmel, Herwig Adenauerstrasse 9 82178 Puchheim / DE | 02 /
Thanhäuser, Gerhard Luisenstrasse 17 86415 Mering / DE | 03 /
Stummer, Baldur Wilhelm-Kuhnert-Strasse 21 81543 München / DE | [2000/35] | Application number, filing date | 00102996.6 | 14.02.2000 | [2000/35] | Priority number, date | DE1999107756 | 23.02.1999 Original published format: DE 19907756 | [2000/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1032133 | Date: | 30.08.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H03L7/08 | [2000/35] | CPC: |
H03L7/091 (EP,US);
H03L7/085 (EP,US);
H03L7/181 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2001/20] |
Former [2000/35] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Phasenregelkreis mit geringem Phasenfehler | [2000/35] | English: | Phase locked loop with low phase error | [2000/35] | French: | Boucle à verrouillage de phase à faible erreur de phase | [2000/35] | Examination procedure | 18.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/46] | 26.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.07.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/02] | 12.08.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/02] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2002 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5126693 (GULLIVER WILLIAM H [US], et al) [A] * column W *; | [A]WO9534127 (SIERRA SEMICONDUCTOR CORP [US]) [A] * column W *; | [Y]EP0844761 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 1-11 * column W *; | [Y]EP0847142 (NEC CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-11 * column 6, line 34 - column 9, line 10 * |