EP1126742 - Method for protection switching of transmission equipment in MPLS networks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.11.2002 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.01.2003 [2003/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/34] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Klink, Joachim, Dipl.-Ing. Ostmarkstrasse 24 81377 München / DE | [2001/34] | Application number, filing date | 00103083.2 | 15.02.2000 | [2001/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1126742 | Date: | 22.08.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q11/04 | [2001/34] | CPC: |
H04Q11/0478 (EP,US);
H04L2012/5619 (EP,US);
H04L2012/5627 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | [2002/21] |
Former [2001/34] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Ersatzschalten von Übertragungseinrichtungen in MPLS-Netzen | [2001/34] | English: | Method for protection switching of transmission equipment in MPLS networks | [2001/34] | French: | Méthode de commutation de protection des dispositifs de transmission dans des réseaux MPLS | [2001/34] | Examination procedure | 23.02.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/01] | 17.07.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2003/01] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 18.04.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2002 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2002 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2002 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2002 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.04.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 18.04.2002 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2002 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]DE19646016 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [DA] 1-16 * column 1, line 64 - column 5, line 27 *; | [A] - ANDERSON J ET AL, "VIRTUAL PATH GROUP PROTECTION SWITCHING - A METHOD FOR FAST ATM NETWORK SURVIVABILITY", BELL LABS TECHNICAL JOURNAL,US,BELL LABORATORIES, (19970321), vol. 2, no. 2, ISSN 1089-7089, pages 213 - 232, XP000695177 [A] 1-16 * page 224 - page 225 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/bltj.2057 | [A] - SUN H ET AL, "Supporting IP on the ATM networks: an overview", COMPUTER COMMUNICATIONS,NL,ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS BV, AMSTERDAM, (19980810), vol. 21, no. 11, ISSN 0140-3664, pages 1020 - 1029, XP004138773 [A] 1-16 * page 1026 - page 1028, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0140-3664(98)00174-1 | [A] - VEITCH P ET AL, "ATM NETWROK RESILIENCE", IEEE NETWORK: THE MAGAZINE OF COMPUTER COMMUNICATIONS,US,IEEE INC. NEW YORK, (19970901), vol. 11, no. 5, ISSN 0890-8044, pages 26 - 33, XP000699938 [A] 1-16 * page 27, column L, paragraph 4 - page 28, column L, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/65.620519 |