EP1029782 - Power tilt device, in particular for lifting and lowering a marine propulsion unit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.08.2005 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.09.2005 [2005/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOQI K.K. 200-1 Sakagawa Kagegawa-City Shizuoka-Prefecture / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/34] | For all designated states SOQI K.K. 200-1 Sakagawa Kagegawa-City, Shizuoka-Prefecture / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Saito, Hideki, c/o SOQI Kabushiki Kaisha 200-1 Sakagawa Kakegawa-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | [2000/34] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/34] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00103528.6 | 18.02.2000 | [2000/34] | Priority number, date | JP19990039899 | 18.02.1999 Original published format: JP 3989999 | [2000/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1029782 | Date: | 23.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1029782 | Date: | 05.06.2002 | [2002/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1029782 | Date: | 29.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B63H20/10, F15B15/00, F15B11/00, F15B21/04 | [2002/23] | CPC: |
B63H20/10 (EP,US);
F15B11/003 (EP,US);
F15B21/044 (EP,US);
F15B7/006 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/34] | B63H20/10, F15B15/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2003/09] |
Former [2000/34] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Motorische Neigevorrichtung, insbesondere zum Heben und Senken einer marinen Vortriebseinheit | [2000/34] | English: | Power tilt device, in particular for lifting and lowering a marine propulsion unit | [2000/34] | French: | Appareil de basculement motorisé, en particulier pour lever et pour abaisser un ensemble de propulsion marine | [2000/34] | Examination procedure | 05.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/36] | 22.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.01.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2452369 (EVERETT GRAVENHORST, et al) [A] 3,9,10 * column 3, line 14 - line 24; figure 2 *; | [YA]US4064824 (HALL CHARLES B, et al) [Y] 1,2 * column 6, line 60 - line 68 * * column 8, line 47 - column 9, line 41; figure 2 * [A] 3,4,6,8,9; | [A]US4631035 (NAKAHAMA RYOJI [JP]) [A] 1,7-9* column 4, line 33 - column 5, line 5; figure 5 *; | [YA]US5444979 (FUNAMI YASUO [JP], et al) [Y] 1,2 * column 3, line 7 - column 5, line 5; figures 1,5-8 * [A] 3-6,8,10 |