EP1032223 - Signalling point of a signalling network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.12.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 23.09.2009 [2009/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Siemens Networks GmbH & Co. KG St. Martin Strasse 76 81541 München / DE | [2008/05] |
Former [2007/50] | For all designated states NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS GMBH & CO. KG St. Martin Strasse 76 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/46] | For all designated states NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS S.P.A. St. Martin Strasse 76 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/38] | For all designated states NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS GMBH & CO. KG St. Martin Strasse 76 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/35] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Angermayr, Manfred Brudermühlstrasse 11 81371 München / DE | 02 /
Gradischnig, Klaus David Max-Klinger-Strasse 28 82131 Gauting / DE | 03 /
Tüxen, Michael, Dr. Gasparistrasse 8 81479 München / DE | [2000/35] | Application number, filing date | 00103534.4 | 18.02.2000 | [2000/35] | Priority number, date | DE1999106809 | 18.02.1999 Original published format: DE 19906809 | [2000/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1032223 | Date: | 30.08.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1032223 | Date: | 21.03.2001 | [2001/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1032223 | Date: | 30.01.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q3/00 | [2000/35] | CPC: |
H04Q3/0025 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [2001/50] |
Former [2000/35] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Signalisierungspunkt eines Signalisierungsnetzes | [2000/35] | English: | Signalling point of a signalling network | [2000/35] | French: | Point de signalisation dans un réseau de signalisation | [2007/33] |
Former [2000/35] | Point de sgnalisation dans un réseau de signalisation | Examination procedure | 19.09.2001 | Examination requested [2001/46] | 28.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 23.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.12.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 14.12.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/02] | Request for further processing for: | 04.03.2005 | Request for further processing filed | 04.03.2005 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.03.2005 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 30.01.2008 | IT | 30.01.2008 | SE | 30.04.2008 | ES | 11.05.2008 | [2009/39] |
Former [2009/04] | GB | 30.01.2008 | |
SE | 30.04.2008 | ||
ES | 11.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | SE | 30.04.2008 | |
ES | 11.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | ES | 11.05.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5848069 (MILNE RICHARD E [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * column 1, line 59 - column 2, line 17 * * column 2, line 52 - line 67 * * column 5, line 17 - line 34 *; | [A]EP0681405 (IBM [US]) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * page 3, line 11 - page 4, line 26 *; | [A] - MARKOV Z ET AL, "ANALYSIS OF SIGNALING LOAD SHARING IN FULLY AVAILABLE CCS NO. 7 LINK SET USED IN TELEPHONE NETWORK", AEU INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF ELECTRONICS AND COMMUNICATIONS,DE,GUSTAV FISHER VERLAG, JENA, (1998), vol. 52, no. 4, ISSN 1434-8411, pages 279 - 281, XP000846796 [A] 1-6 * page 279, paragraph 2 * * page 279, paragraph 3 * |